pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


No Duff Charitable Trust
No Duff
CC54402
9429046029157
Registered

Registration details

25/03/2017
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 204
Palmerston North Central
Palmerston North
4440

Charity's other details

027 838 3726
Facebook icon image
No Duff Charitable Trust
https://nodufforgnz.wordpress.com/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Trust provides support to current and former members of the NZDF, Commonwealth (or other allied country) service persons, their immediate families and direct dependants in order to ensure that their mental, physical, financial, spiritual and social health is maintained at the highest possible level.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Emergency / disaster relief

Other (please state)

(Current and former service persons)

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust. Per the Trust Deed there is to be a minimum of three & maximum of six trustees, at least 2/3 of whom are to be veterans (as defined in the Deed).

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 13/12/2018 $193,645 $78,294
31/12/2017 4/10/2017 $5,525 $340

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Dan Hardy Trustee 28/08/2019
Rod Toi Trustee 8/08/2019
Simon Ritson Trustee 8/12/2017
Aaron Wood Trustee & CEO 21/03/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Christopher Elles Chairperson 16/07/2019
Sam Gillgren Treasurer 14/07/2019
Terraine Hollis Trustee 15/04/2019
Gary Ford Treasurer 12/12/2018
Christopher Morris Chairman 10/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
30/08/2019 NOC008
29/08/2019 NOC007
29/07/2019 NOC006
9/05/2019 NOC005
10/02/2018 NOC003
6/05/2017 NOC001

Charity Documents