pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Ngai Tahu Capital Limited
Ngai Tahu Equities Trust
CC35571
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

15 Show Place
Addington
Christchurch
8011
PO Box 13046
Armagh
Wigram
Christchurch
8141

Charity's other details

03 371 2613
03 341 6792

Group Members


Below are all the members of Ngai Tahu Charitable Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
CNI Tourism Limited
Dart River Safaris Limited
Glacier Southern Lakes Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Helicopters Queenstown Limited
Hoaka Limited
Hollyford Valley Walk Limited
Hukafalls Jet Limited
MWD Helicopters Limited
Ngai Tahu Aquaculture Services Limited
Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Refer to the constitution

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(All Profits Applied to Ngai Tahu Charitable trust)

Other (please state)

(All Profits Applied To Ngai Tahu Charitable Trust)

Other charities

Other Charities - Ngai Tahu charitable trust

Entity Structure

Corporate trustee for charitable trust.

Annual Returns


Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Please note: This charity is a member a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Paul Silk Trustee 4/11/2011
Catherine Margaret Drayton Trustee 25/09/2009
Trevor Burt Trustee 25/09/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Samford (sandy) Lee Maier Trustee 30/08/2013
Ross Keenan Director 31/10/2011
Linda Susan Constable Director 1/07/2011
Mark Tume Director 30/06/2009
Walter Leonard Stone Director 3/03/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/03/2015 NOC009
3/09/2013 NOC008
8/11/2011 NOC007
15/07/2011 NOC006
14/06/2011 NOC005
26/11/2010 NOC004
18/10/2010 NOC003
28/01/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents