pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Dunedin Curtain Bank Trust
CC49065
Registered

Registration details

8/02/2013
March 31

Address for service

174 Princes Street
Dunedin Central
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

03 425 9678

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Dunedin Curtain Bank believes that everyone has a right to a warm and healthy home. The Curtain Bank provides free thermally lined curtains to those in the Dunedin area in need.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Accommodation / housing, Community development, Social services, People with disabilities

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities, General public, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

The DCB is governed by a board of Trustees

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2017 21/09/2017 $65,144 $62,521
30/09/2016 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $45,576 $41,117
30/06/2015 30/06/2015 $43,414 $40,712
30/06/2014 11/06/2014 $22,258 $19,588

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Louise Margaret Climo Chairperson 14/03/2017
Stacey Hitchcock Trustee 10/05/2016
Stephanie Smith Trustee 24/08/2015
Amy Coleman Treasurer 17/12/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Micaela Kena Chairperson 10/12/2017
Belinda Kay Le Lievre Trustee 14/03/2017
Virginia Margaret Driver Trustee 14/12/2016
Kate Rabbidge Trustee 30/03/2016
Lisa Ford Trustee 3/02/2016
Elizabeth MacDonald Trustee 17/09/2014
Beth Evans Trustee 14/05/2014
Lee-Anne MacAuliffe Co-ordinator 1/06/2013
Jane Marie Mountier Secretary 14/05/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/03/2017 NOC013
10/01/2017 NOC010
15/12/2016 NOC009
26/05/2016 NOC008
18/03/2015 NOC006
3/11/2014 NOC005
29/05/2014 NOC004
13/09/2013 NOC003
15/07/2013 NOC002
7/06/2013 NOC001

Charity Documents