pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Branch Foundation
The Branch Foundation
CC20996
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Opportunity for Poor Children New Zealand 8/02/2008
The Branch Foundation 1/12/2008

Registration details

8/02/2008
March 31

Address for service

2 Kauri Point Road
Laingholm
Auckland
604

Charity's other details

+ 64 (0) 210424910
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/The-Branch-Foundation-48885609241/?fref=ts
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/BranchFound

Asia

Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, Thailand

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Branch Foundation aims to work alongside marginalized communities in Southeast Asia to support sustainable community development through education, capacity building and renewable energy solutions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Community development

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Emergency / disaster relief, Arts / culture / heritage, International activities, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Migrants / refugees

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2009.

Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
- 31/03/2017 - - - -
8/08/2016 31/03/2016 $22,559 $31,292
3/06/2015 31/03/2015 $44,620 $39,700
2/07/2014 31/03/2014 $41,502 $32,268
13/06/2013 30/03/2013 $31,845 $33,624
8/05/2012 31/03/2012 $33,937 $35,088
6/05/2011 31/03/2011 $10,107 $7,612
12/04/2010 31/03/2010 $8,915 $7,019
22/05/2009 1/03/2009 $1,160 $1,260

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Tom Edward Rosen Trustee 23/07/2016
Glen Williams Accountant 1/02/2015
Brigitte Martha Lorenz Trustee 17/05/2009
Annabel Harrison Trustee 8/02/2008
Iona Karuna Dolma Proebst Co-ordinator 8/02/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jesse Chalmers Trustee 1/12/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/05/2012 AR005
6/05/2011 AR004
21/05/2010 NOC007
12/04/2010 AR003
22/05/2009 AR002
13/05/2009 NOC006
10/02/2009 NOC005
2/02/2009 NOC004
9/12/2008 NOC003
13/02/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents