pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Virtuoso Strings Charitable Trust Board
Virtuoso Strings Charitable Trust
CC50199
9429043253104
Registered

Registration details

11/02/2014
March 31

Address for service

9 Fitzwilliam Terrace
Tawa
Wellington
5028
Unit 3
73 Kenepuru Drive
Kenepuru
Porirua
5022

Charity's other details

0277899543
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/VirtuosoStringsPorirua


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to generate social benefit through the provision of accessible, inclusive and holistic music education in a community-based setting with an emphasis on group music-making.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Provides free music tuition, instruments, food, trips & recreation to socio-economically deprived communities. Runs youth orchestras & holiday programmes in socio-economically deprived neighbourhoods.)

Social services

Education / training / research, Community development, Arts / culture / heritage

Children / young people

Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, socially or economically disadvantaged communities or families

Entity Structure

The Virtuoso Strings Charitable Trust Board is a registered and incorporated charity governed by trustees appointed according to the board's trust deed.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/10/2020 29/10/2020 $541,610 $454,264
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $305,857 $311,797
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $170,269 $152,271
30/09/2017 8/10/2017 $96,288 $70,564
30/09/2016 27/06/2016 $82,984 $52,020
30/09/2015 9/11/2015 $34,413 $24,440
30/09/2014 30/09/2014 $352 $2

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Arthur Anthony Shaw Trustee 5/04/2021
Toli Sagaga Trustee 19/10/2020
Robert James Barton Trustee 8/05/2020
Hon Luamanuvao Dame Winifred Alexandra Laban Trustee 19/11/2019
Paul Raymond Setefano Trustee 31/01/2019
James Faraimo Trustee 2/02/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Elizabeth Sarah Neal Sneyd First Trustee 5/11/2020
Joyce Fuatavai Trustee 20/12/2018
Siang Kuen Jeffries First Trustee 2/02/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
4/05/2021 NOC015
5/11/2020 NOC014
1/07/2020 NOC012
11/06/2020 NOC011
25/03/2019 NOC009
26/01/2019 NOC008
8/02/2018 NOC006
2/02/2018 NOC005
28/09/2017 NOC003
28/09/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents