pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Quit Group
The Quit Group Charitable Trust
CC35987
9429043155781
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

c/o BDO Wellington Ltd
PO Box 10340
The Terrace
Wellington
6143
c/o BDO Wellington Ltd
Level 1
50 Customhouse Quay
Wellington
6143

Charity's other details

04 472 5850
04 473 3582


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Quit Group is committed to helping all New Zealanders quit smoking, with a particular focus on Māori, Pacific peoples and pregnant women.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Health

Education / training / research

General public

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

The Quit Group is an incorporated charitable trust established in 1999.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The Quit Group Holdings Limited CC46574

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 10/12/2019 $89,056 $178,043
31/12/2018 27/12/2018 $98,147 $301,814
31/12/2017 27/12/2017 $77,437 $222,439
31/12/2016 23/12/2016 $3,242,980 $3,342,497
31/12/2015 14/09/2015 $9,561,822 $9,363,786
31/12/2014 4/12/2014 $9,519,925 $9,286,750
31/12/2013 18/09/2013 $9,608,120 $9,824,416
31/12/2012 15/11/2012 $9,813,937 $9,585,874
31/12/2011 23/11/2011 $10,010,612 $9,812,456
31/12/2010 13/01/2011 $9,999,482 $9,326,608

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annette Milligan Trustee 1/08/2015
Mary McCulloch Trustee 1/08/2015
Janet Pearson Trustee 11/02/2010
Christopher William Cunningham Trustee 15/05/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew John Lees Jackson Trustee 31/03/2016
Elizabeth Hirst Trustee 31/03/2016
Annette Margaret Milligan Chair 30/06/2013
Pauline Winter Trustee 7/09/2012
Ceillhe Sperath Trustee 10/02/2011
Dalton Leo Kelly Trustee 11/02/2010
Mary Angela McCulloch-Coupe Trustee 4/09/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/06/2016 NOC014
18/11/2015 NOC013
29/10/2015 NOC012
29/10/2015 NOC011
27/10/2015 NOC010
18/09/2013 AR007
15/11/2012 AR006
6/06/2012 NOC004
20/04/2011 NOC003
13/01/2011 AR004

Charity Documents