pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Extension granted by Charities Services until 30 November 2016.

Te Hahi o Nga Matamua Holdings Limited
CC31644
9429035119890
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Simpatico Holdings Limited 30/06/2008
Te Hahi o Nga Matamua Holdings Limited 10/03/2010

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 76433
Manukau City
Auckland
2241
25 Druces Road
Wiri
Auckland
2104

Charity's other details

095708773
095708772


Group Members


Below are all the members of Destiny International Group. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Destiny International Trust
Te Hahi o Nga Matamua Holdings Limited

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provide buildings, facilities and financial support to charitable entities committed to advancing religion.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

Accommodation / housing

Community development, Religious activities, Fund-raising

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Te Hahi o nga Matamua Holdings Limited is a charitable company governed by a board of directors. 100% of the shareholding for this company is owned by Destiny International Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 Member of 'Destiny International Group' group - click here to view Annual Return
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $1,440,207 $1,470,067
30/09/2014 5/12/2014 $1,416,477 $1,386,926
30/09/2013 29/10/2014 $1,842,938 $3,593,600
30/09/2012 31/01/2013 $1,353,749 $1,029,867
30/09/2011 2/03/2012 $1,805,860 $1,393,065
30/09/2010 18/03/2011 $1,157,543 $780,621
30/09/2009 15/01/2010 $2,321,826 $801,172

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David Lawrence Hohepa Kahu Director 3/02/2014
Talamasene Leiasamaivao Trustee 25/06/2013
Hannah Radclavina Huirangi Tamaki Director 5/03/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Samuel Brian Francis Tamaki Trustee 30/09/2014
Richard Charles Lewis Director 17/09/2013
Caine Daniel Warren Director 25/06/2013
Tania Suzanne Pene Director 25/06/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
23/07/2014 NOC008
17/12/2013 NOC007
10/07/2013 NOC004
26/03/2013 NOC003
10/03/2010 NOC002
15/01/2010 AR002

Charity Documents