pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Harwood Farm Trust
CC22798
N/A
Registered

Registration details

9/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 38
Dannevirke
4942
6 Gordon Street
Dannevirke

Charity's other details

06 374 7059
06 374 7057


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To ensure that the objects contained in the Deed of Trust are met, thereby ensuring that Miss Arnaboldi's aspirations are realized. These include: -to promote the training and education of people in farming and to promote research and education, development and extension in the sciences of agriculture, horticulture, forestry, deer farming, cropping and all other forms of farming activity and of projects relating to the use of land and to productivity. -to provide, in particular, training and education in the farming of East Coast hill country within New Zealand. -to provide support and assistance for people undertaking agricultural courses at any institution established for that purpose within New Zealand -to establish bursaries, scholarships, funds, grants, prize, awards, trophies, or memorials. -to promote facilities in the Weber district to improve to improve the quality of life of people living in and around that farming district.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Education / training / research

Community development

Children / young people

General public, Youth/students

Entity Structure

The trust was established by Miss Myra Arnaboldi on the 9th of November 1981 to ensure her aspirations were realised. The trust is a Charitable Trust established under the Charitable Trusts Act and registered as a charitable entity under the Charities Act 2005. There is provision in the Trust Deed which requires that there will always be a Solicitor and a Chartered Accountant appointed as trustees, from the firms of solicitors and accountants who acted for Miss Arnaboldi during her lifetime.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
31/12/2020 11/01/2021 $858,872 $742,863
31/12/2019 11/12/2019 $673,741 $728,506
31/12/2018 31/01/2019 $979,100 $665,754
31/12/2017 24/06/2018 $504,211 $563,155
31/12/2016 18/06/2017 $669,306 $621,605
31/12/2015 26/10/2015 $532,746 $510,142
31/12/2014 13/01/2015 $541,245 $467,108
31/12/2013 25/11/2013 $424,447 $562,547
31/12/2012 8/02/2013 $712,169 $515,397

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Shaun Rhys Morgans Trustee 5/05/2015
MCI Trustees Limited Trustee 24/06/2008
Murray Alexander Pringle Trustee 17/10/2001

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
John Patrick Dodson Trustee 30/06/2019
Peter Massey Jackson Smith Trustee 2/05/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/01/2015 NOC004
2/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents