pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Wakatipu Wildlife Trust
CC54794
9429046225825
Registered

Registration details

14/07/2017
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 91168
Wakatipu
Frankton
Queenstown
9349
23/159 Gorge Road
Queenstown
9300

Charity's other details

034412424
034412426


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Encouraging the establishment of a network of projects designed to make the greater Lake Wakatipu area predator free and thus enable birds and other native wildlife to flourish.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Environment / conservation

General public

Entity Structure

We are based in Queenstown and our focus is on acting as an umbrella organisation supporting localised predator elimination groups through out the greater Lake Wakatipu region. We have seven trustees as per our Trust Deed and they carry out the work of the Trust. We also additionally have a chartered accountant as treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/11/2018 26/11/2018 $44,598 $13,359

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
David John Penrose Trustee 25/10/2018
Philip James Green Trustee 25/10/2018
Thomas McNeil Pryde Trustee 13/07/2017
Benjamin Ivan Perchik Trustee 2/06/2017
Penelope Jane Clark Trustee 2/06/2017
Philippa Jane Speedy Trustee 2/06/2017
Warren Richard Skerrett Trustee 2/06/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Paul Alexis Griffin Trustee 25/10/2018
Wulf Solter Trustee 25/10/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/12/2018 NOC003

Charity Documents