pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Onehunga Swimming Club Incorporated
CC42901
Registered

Registration details

23/11/2009
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 13879
Onehunga
Auckland
1643
C/- Jellicoe Swimming Pool
Park Gardens Rd
Onehunga
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

09 634 3905

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To encourage and promote competitive swimming at an amateur level. To provide a pathway to competitive swimming for both the clubs non-competitive swimmers and also other swimmers. To provide community based swimming opportunities for children as a means to encourage and develop swimming, water education, and fitness skills. To provide members access to swimming pool facilities for recreation, education and training purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides services - water safety and learn to swim

Sport / recreation

Health, Community development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Children / young people

Older people, People with disabilities, General public

Entity Structure

Onehunga Swimming Club Inc. is an incorporated society governed by a management committee.

Annual Returns


Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2010 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2011.

Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/09/2016 31/03/2016 $13,713 $6,625
24/05/2016 31/03/2015 $9,500 $7,947
15/10/2015 31/03/2014 $26,053 $18,796
15/01/2015 31/03/2013 $45,434 $33,615
28/03/2013 30/03/2012 $110,582 $177,913
30/08/2012 30/03/2011 $160,727 $183,327
4/12/2010 31/03/2010 $172,017 $205,398

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Claire Barry President 20/05/2016
Matthew Laurenson Secretary and registrar 20/05/2016
Michael Jones Treasurer 20/05/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jon Vao President 20/05/2016
Judy Gao Treasurer 20/05/2016
Margo Clegg Secretary 20/05/2016
Colin Ernstzen President 31/03/2013
Victoria Villaraza Treasurer 3/04/2012
David William Mair Secretary 6/08/2011
Joanna Susan Milne Secretary 13/07/2010
Vanda Jelacic Kocks Treasurer 13/07/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/06/2016 NOC006
15/01/2015 NOC005
21/03/2013 AR004
30/08/2012 AR003
4/12/2010 AR002
11/09/2010 NOC002

Charity Documents