pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Christchurch Earthquake Appeal Trust
CC46329
N/A
Registered

Registration details

10/03/2011
June 30

Address for service

Christchurch Earthquake Appeal Trust
PO Box 805
Wellington
6140
45 Pipitea Street
46 Waring Taylor Street
Thorndon
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

0800 448 444


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Christchurch Earthquake Appeal was set up to complement emergency support provided by other charitable agencies, and core government responsibilities. The Appeal continues to help restore for Christchurch comminities, the places and services that make a city worth living in. When the earthquake struck Canterbury, community facilities which took decades of fundraising to put in place, such as sports fields, parks, community buildings and historic buildings, were ruined within hours. OBJECTIVES OF THE TRUST * the relief of poverty; * the advancement of education; * the advancement of religion; * the advancement of any other purposes beneficial to the community; and * the advancement of any other purposes that are charitable under the law of New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities

Emergency / disaster relief

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Community development, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Care / protection of animals, Economic development, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Religious groups

Entity Structure

There are three Trustees. The Trustees are responsible for the allocation of Appeal funds to support earthquake recovery initiatives. The Secretary for Internal Affairs and the Secretary to the Treasury are positions held by the chief executives of those government departments, and are not political appointments. The Trustees appointed an Advisory Board of community representatives to provide the Trustees with additional local perspective and advice on specific proposals.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

The first annual return due on the 31/12/2011 will cover less than six months after the charity is registered. For this reason the charity is granted an exemption to filing their first annual return under s41 (1) of the Charities Act 2005, and the first annual return will be due by the 31/12/2012. Liam Beashel (Acting Manager Registration) has granted an exemption for annual return filing fees for years ending June 2011, 2012, 2013 and 2014 under s43 of the Act. They will need to re-apply for future years.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 17/11/2020 $1,225,551 $600,050
31/12/2019 30/10/2019 $3,687,073 $6,038,050
31/12/2018 18/10/2018 $1,599,255 $1,000,050
31/12/2017 9/11/2017 $1,286,857 $817,949
31/12/2016 17/10/2016 $2,024,513 $7,900,953
31/12/2015 16/09/2015 $2,307,049 $4,310,927
31/12/2014 23/11/2014 $3,858,041 $17,578,012
31/12/2013 27/11/2014 $8,866,901 $33,102,367
31/12/2012 16/11/2012 $41,206,115 $35,650,617
31/12/2011 16/11/2012 $45,678,073 $4,082,700

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Caralee McLiesh Trustee 16/09/2019
Paul David James Trustee 1/10/2018
Roderick Marshall Carr Trustee 6/04/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gabriel Makhlouf Trustee 28/06/2019
Colin MacDonald Trustee 3/08/2018
Pietro Mersi Trustee 16/04/2012
Brendan James Boyle Trustee 23/09/2011
John Henry Whitehead Trustee 31/05/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/10/2018 NOC011
12/09/2018 NOC010
26/09/2014 NOC008
26/10/2012 AR001
30/07/2012 NOC005
16/11/2011 NOC004
27/07/2011 NOC003
14/03/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents