pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Great Barrier Island Environmental Trust
CC22897
9429043022861
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Great Barrier Island Charitable Trust 14/04/2008
Great Barrier Island Environmental Trust 13/01/2016

Registration details

13/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

P O Box 35
Okiwi
Great Barrier Island
0960
Aotea Road
Okiwi
Great Barrier Island
0991

Charity's other details

022 344 2438
Facebook icon image
GreatBarrierIslandEnvironmentalTrust
Twitter icon image
@GreatBarrierIslandEnvironmentTrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Our mission is to work with our community to protect native species through the eradication of rats and feral cats, to re-introduce species lost to the island, and to work towards an ecology-based economy for Great Barrier Island/Aotea. We focus on research, projects that protect biodiversity, communication and advocacy that inform and support decision-making that enables the community to act to protect the biodiversity of the island for future generations.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Community development, Economic development, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust is made up of Members, volunteers, run by elected Trustees, with Chairperson and one Staff.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2018 27/07/2018 $22,597 $22,948
30/06/2017 29/06/2017 $38,288 $27,691
30/06/2016 4/04/2016 $33,456 $29,591
30/06/2015 31/07/2015 $29,814 $28,513
30/06/2014 18/05/2014 $54,682 $39,895
30/06/2013 20/05/2013 $38,282 $39,360
30/06/2012 24/05/2012 $27,637 $39,875
30/06/2011 2/06/2011 $52,619 $40,803
30/06/2010 10/06/2010 $44,774 $38,887
30/06/2009 9/06/2009 $69,876 $62,385

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
George Perry Trustee 3/08/2017
Matthew Way Trustee 18/06/2017
Emma Waterhouse Trustee 27/04/2016
Alison Walker Trustee 1/07/2015
June Brookes Trustee 1/07/2015
Kate Waterhouse Trustee 18/02/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Emmy Pratt Trustee 10/02/2018
John Ogden Trustee 31/05/2017
Des Casey Trustee 1/03/2016
Taryn Wilks Trustee 31/12/2015
Peter Graham Alexander Edmonds Trustee 13/06/2015
Peter Graham Alexander Edmonds Trustee 13/06/2015
Elizabeth Westbrooke Trustee 24/04/2014
Judith Gilbert Trustee 15/02/2013
Wayne Anderson Trustee 1/03/2012
Fenella Christian Trustee 18/02/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
20/01/2016 NOC013
3/08/2015 NOC012
3/08/2015 NOC011
27/03/2013 NOC006
27/03/2013 NOC005
24/05/2012 AR005
2/06/2011 NOC004
20/10/2010 NOC003
10/06/2010 AR003
22/05/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents