pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


International Needs Incorporated
CC23686
9429043023172
Registered

Registration details

30/04/2008
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
IN Network Incorporated 1/05/2008
International Needs Incorporated 3/10/2012

Address for service

PO Box 1165
Seventh Avenue
Tauranga
3140
120 Eleventh Avenue
Tauranga
3110

Charity's other details

(07)5786198

Oceania

Australia, Papua New Guinea, Tonga

Africa

Burkina, Congo, Egypt, Ethiopia, Ghana, Kenya, Tanzania, Uganda, Zambia

South America

Colombia

North America

Canada, Dominican Republic, United States

Asia

Bangladesh, Burma (Myanmar), Cambodia, India, Nepal, Philippines, Sri Lanka, Turkey, Vietnam

Europe

Bulgaria, Czech Republic, Romania, Slovakia


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

A worldwide partnership of Christian organizations fulfilling the commission of Jesus Christ, supporting each other to see transformed lives, families and communities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities, Child sponsorship

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Health, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, International activities, Economic development, Fund-raising, Promotion of volunteering

Other charities

Children / young people, People with disabilities, Religious groups

Entity Structure

The structure of the society consists under a Congress of delegates from members, under a constitution, which maintains a governance Council and executive committee EC. The EC is comprised of the officers of Congress being chair, vice chair, secretary and treasurer, and a CAO overseeing operations.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2020 30/06/2020 $210,428 $134,377
30/06/2019 9/07/2019 $193,054 $70,973
30/06/2018 26/06/2018 $211,446 $80,519
30/06/2017 22/06/2017 $162,342 $123,568
30/06/2016 30/06/2016 $166,939 $150,981
30/06/2015 30/06/2015 $153,613 $141,179
30/06/2014 15/10/2014 $162,854 $167,251
30/06/2013 4/07/2013 $164,372 $164,554
30/06/2012 29/06/2012 $192,111 $234,584

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Justus Miwanda Secretary 24/05/2019
Mark William Bleyer Treasurer 24/05/2019
Samuel Abimerech Luboga Secretary 24/03/2017
David Marshall Vice Chair of Board 4/10/2014
Edmond Vanderpuye Treasurer 4/10/2014
Santosh Gnanakan Board Chairman 4/10/2014

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gradon Johnson Harvey Secretary 18/03/2016
Peter Staley Chairman 18/03/2016
Ladoyt Rodeheaver Vice Chairperson 4/10/2014
Walter Pimpong Treasurer 4/10/2014
Esme Bowers Board Member 3/10/2012
John Frank Megginson Trustee 3/10/2012
Mark Bleyer Board Member 3/10/2012
Piri Simpson Board Member 3/10/2012
Reindorf Perbi Board member 3/10/2012
Robert Keam Board member 3/10/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/06/2017 NOC016
9/12/2016 NOC015
7/12/2016 NOC014
5/07/2016 NOC013
2/07/2015 NOC012
30/06/2015 NOC011
5/02/2013 NOC006
19/10/2012 NOC005
29/06/2012 AR006
7/07/2011 AR005

Charity Documents