pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Johnsonville Charitable Trust
CC22101
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Johnsonville Licensing (Charitable) Trust 26/03/2008
Johnsonville Charitable Trust 29/06/2009

Registration details

25/03/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 13072
Johnsonville
Wellington
6440
15 Kaiwharawhara Road
Kaiwharawhara
Wellington
6035

Charity's other details

(04)4785799
(04)4789979


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To support and encourage local organisations (primarily based in the Johnsonville area) to achieve their goals relating to the advancement of education, science, literature, art, physical welfare, culture, or recreation, through the provision of financial support

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Community development

Education / training / research, Social services, Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, General public

Entity Structure

Board consisting of five members

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
Johnsonville Property Trust Limited CC22302

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2017 5/09/2017 $688,726 $780,981
30/09/2016 20/09/2016 $712,542 $777,528
30/09/2015 24/08/2015 $100,000 $94,000
30/09/2014 1/09/2014 $100,000 $107,000
30/09/2013 21/08/2013 $101,000 $201,000
30/09/2012 8/08/2012 $204,000 $103,000
30/09/2011 11/08/2011 $0 $50,000
30/09/2010 14/09/2010 $201,000 $79,000
30/09/2009 22/09/2009 $2,000 $66,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Christine Kaye Davies Trustee 27/06/2017
Justin Lester Trustee 28/06/2012
Tracy Ann Hurst-porter Trustee 25/06/2010
James Candiliotis Trustee 26/03/2008
Raymond John Good Trustee 26/03/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Camilia Keem Kim Chin Trustee 27/06/2017
Deborah Lee Avison Trustee 5/05/2014
Michael Graham Collett Trustee 10/02/2014
Ian Rex Hutchings Trustee 28/06/2012
Kentigern Clark Trustee 25/06/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/12/2015 NOC012
15/09/2014 NOC011
24/06/2014 NOC010
5/09/2013 NOC006
8/08/2012 AR005
20/01/2011 NOC005
2/08/2010 NOC004
3/08/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents