pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Rule Foundation
CC39280
N/A
Registered

Registration details

15/04/2009
March 31

Address for service

Level 12
11 Hunter Street
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Rule Foundation is a charity concerned with the welfare, wellbeing and health of lesbian, gay, bisexual, transgender, and intersex (LGBTI) people in New Zealand. We give funds to groups and individuals who provide support services or community activities for LGBTI people, or who undertake education and research on LGBTI issues.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Social services

Education / training / research, Health, Arts / culture / heritage

Voluntary bodies other than charities

Children / young people, Other charities

Entity Structure

Trustees elect a Chair, Secretary and Treasurer at the Annual General Meeting. The Foundation employs no staff.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 11/10/2018 $283 $33,973
30/09/2017 22/09/2017 $1,369 $39,697
30/09/2016 8/12/2016 $44,997 $47,176
30/09/2015 4/11/2015 $51,121 $49,734
30/09/2014 24/09/2014 $59,307 $66,510
30/09/2013 6/09/2013 $41,708 $35,167
30/09/2012 21/09/2012 $28,060 $27,757
30/09/2011 30/08/2011 $17,014 $18,529
30/09/2010 30/07/2010 $11,743 $8,456

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Joy Jennifer Liddicoat Trustee 1/08/2017
Duncan Matthews Treasurer 1/05/2015
Samuel David Mackay Secretary 1/05/2015
Richard Kempthorne Stone Chair 23/01/2012
David Douglas Reeves Trustee 16/04/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Stephen John Park Chair 1/08/2017
Christopher John Mayes Trustee 1/12/2014
David Michael Carson - Parker Trustee 1/12/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/01/2017 NOC013
28/08/2016 NOC011
29/02/2016 NOC009
4/05/2015 NOC008
15/12/2014 NOC007
6/09/2013 AR005
20/09/2012 AR004
29/01/2012 NOC003
30/08/2011 AR003
17/06/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents