pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Big Buddy Mentoring Trust
Big Buddy
CC22447
9429043112487
Registered

Registration details

1/04/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 15319
New Lynn
Auckland
640
39 Roberton Road
Avondale
Auckland
1026

Charity's other details

(09)828 1358


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Big Buddy Mentoring Trust provides a mentoring programme for fatherless boys in New Zealand. Big Buddy Mentoring Trust recruits, screens and trains volunteer mentors from the community to become mentors for fatherless boys.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Community development

Children / young people

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Big Buddy Mentoring Trust is a charitable trust with a board of five Trustees. Trustees are appointed by existing and departing Trustees. The CEO is a non voting Trustee.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 7/11/2018 $839,179 $821,744
31/12/2017 15/10/2017 $816,334 $805,746
31/12/2016 5/11/2016 $645,532 $655,494
31/12/2015 12/10/2015 $628,283 $558,084
31/12/2014 3/10/2014 $513,435 $527,119
31/12/2013 23/11/2013 $607,036 $629,265
31/12/2012 19/11/2012 $650,411 $627,820
31/12/2011 20/12/2011 $597,456 $561,449
31/12/2010 15/11/2010 $548,719 $538,247
31/12/2009 17/12/2008 $488,503 $551,661

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Emma Jane Butcher Trustee 11/06/2018
Paul Burns Chief Executive Trustee 23/08/2017
Mark Stephen Talbot Secretary Treasurer Trustee 26/08/2011
Travis Field Chairperson Trustee 8/12/2010
Wally Thomas Trustee 2/04/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Andrew Cook Trustee 29/05/2018
Richard Aston Chief Executive Trustee 23/08/2017
Mike Murphy Secretary/Treasurer 8/12/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/06/2018 NOC011
6/06/2017 NOC009
18/11/2012 AR005
30/08/2011 NOC003

Charity Documents