pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Turner Syndrome Association of New Zealand Incorporated
CC46754
9429042877073
Registered

Registration details

10/07/2011
March 31

Address for service

351 Carlton Street
Te Awamutu
3800

Charity's other details

02108925114
Facebook icon image
turner syndrome support group new zealand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

3.1. The purposes of the TSANZI are to: 3.1.1. Provide support to individuals with Turner Syndrome; 3.1.2. Provide support to the families of individuals with Turner Syndrome; 3.1.3. Create local and national support networks; 3.1.4. Provide advocacy; 3.1.5. Provide education and awareness; 3.1.6. Create and maintain a system to promote and support those with Turner Syndrome; 3.1.7. Provide conferences; 3.1.8. Provide camps for young people with Turner Syndrome; 3.1.9. Work with other international organisations for those with Turner Syndrome; 3.1.10. Provide grants to assist individuals with or families of individuals with Turner Syndrome to achieve the above purposes; and 3.1.11. Do anything necessary or helpful to the above purposes.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Supporting females with Turner Syndrome and their families )

People with disabilities

People with disabilities

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Volunteers supporting females with Turner Syndrome

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 2/09/2021 $507 $515
30/09/2020 19/07/2020 $495 $715
30/09/2019 23/09/2019 $128 $804
30/06/2018 4/07/2018 $302 $245
30/06/2017 4/07/2018 $71 $495
30/06/2016 7/07/2016 $1,155 $13,702
30/06/2015 17/06/2015 $19,104 $6,788
30/06/2014 3/09/2014 $13,849 $26,040
30/06/2013 3/06/2013 $22,984 $18,769
30/06/2012 7/09/2012 $4,960 $0

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.
= Balance Date Change
- This Annual Return will cover 15 months from 1 January 2018 to 31 March 2019.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
James Edwin Smith Joint Treasurer 26/06/2021
Katherine Anne Beaumont-Smith Joint Treasurer and Grants and Fundraising Officer 26/06/2021
Benjamin Everett President/Chair 29/06/2019
Eleanor Everett Secretary 29/06/2019
Julie Williams Vice President 29/06/2019

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alicia Rose Joughin Chairperson 28/06/2019
Jacqueline Marie Ellingham Treasurer 28/06/2019
Marnie Elizabeth Erkkila Secretary 28/06/2019
Denise Kathetine Van Dam treasurer 23/06/2018
Lynn Sherryl Irene Carter Secretary 23/06/2018
Jessica Rogan Treasurer 30/06/2016
Marina Grantham-Campbell Chairperson 30/06/2016
Elizabeth Rae Somerville Chairperson 7/04/2013
Sally Belinda Hollinshead Treasurer 7/04/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/07/2019 NOC008
22/09/2018 NOC006
4/07/2018 NOC005
7/04/2013 NOC001
7/09/2012 AR001

Charity Documents