pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


St John Benneydale Area Committee
St John
CC34658
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 3215
Waikato Mail Centre
Hamilton
3240
65 Seddon Road
Frankton
Hamilton
3204

Charity's other details

07 846 9594
07 847 2850


Group Members


Below are all the members of St John. Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Kaikoura St. John Foundation Trust
Order of St John Great Barrier Island
St John Alexandra Area Committee
St John Ambulance Financial Control Board - Timaru
St John Amuri Area Committee
St John Ashburton Area Committee
St John Banks Peninsula Area Committee
St John Bay Of Islands Area Committee
St John Benneydale Area Committee
The Priory In New Zealand of the Most Venerable Order of the Hospital of St John of Jerusalem

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The mission of St John in New Zealand is to prevent and relieve sickness and injury and to act to enhance the health and well-being of all people throughout New Zealand.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Emergency / disaster relief, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The Order of St John Central Region Trust Board (CC35048) has been established under The Priory in New Zealand of the Most Venerable Order of the Hospital of St John of Jerusalem Rules (CC35053). The Central Region Trust Board is responsible for the prescribed functions within the region, including the oversight of Area Committees. St John Benneydale Area Committee is an Area Committee located in the Central Region.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009. This charity has been granted an exemption from filing a notice of change form with their amended rules on 4 February 2016 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005.

Please note: This charity is a member of a Group which submits Consolidated Annual Returns. To view these Annual Returns on the Group Summary click here. Any Annual Returns listed below were submitted when this charity was a single entity.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2018 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2017 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2016 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2015 Member of 'St John' group - click here to view Annual Return
31/12/2014 26/11/2014 $778 $5,249
31/12/2013 31/10/2013 $5,003 $39,272
31/12/2012 17/12/2012 $4,881 $3,094
31/12/2011 22/11/2011 $6,625 $3,398
31/12/2010 13/12/2010 $6,100 $3,800

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Angela Davis Area Committee Chairperson 30/11/2017
Lynda Taryn Farnworth Area Committee Secretary 24/06/2017
Robert Francis McDonald Committee Member 24/06/2017
Alicia Fraser Area Committee Treasurer 24/06/2014
Christine Poole Committee Member 24/06/2005
Jillian Harding Committee Member 24/06/2005
Laurel Hodgson Committee Member 24/06/2005

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Anne Marie Kelly 01/12/2009 3/06/2016
Colleen Reilly Committee member 30/11/2014
Judy Deed 01/12/2009 7/11/2013
Rona Maisie Ballantine Area Committee Member 24/06/2011
Tracey Tutaki 01/12/2009 1/12/2010
Simone Paterson Area Committe Chairperson 1/12/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
11/12/2018 NOC015
30/01/2018 NOC013
7/11/2017 NOC012
28/06/2016 NOC009
13/01/2016 NOC008
18/11/2014 NOC007
22/11/2013 NOC006
31/10/2012 NOC003
22/11/2011 AR004
11/11/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents