pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


John Nesfield Trust
CC49695
N/A
Registered

Registration details

5/09/2013
June 30

Address for service

P O Box 13578
Onehunga
Auckland
1643
55 Hugo Johnston Drive
Penrose
Auckland
1061

Charity's other details

09 622 4192


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Assisting Diabetes NZ Auckland Branch by dealing with, and managing, matters relating to any land and buildings which Diabetes NZ Auckland Branch may acquire, lease or possess from time to time.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Accommodation / housing

Other charities

Entity Structure

The Trust is governed by up to three Trustees appointed from time to time by Diabetes NZ Auckland Branch and one Trustee appointed from time to time by Diabetes NZ Inc. Diabetes NZ Auckland Branch and Diabetes NZ Inc. may remove or replace from time to time any Trustee appointed respectively by them.
Diabetes New Zealand

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 10/12/2020 $182,214 $112,194
31/03/2020 31/03/2020 $155,761 $127,428
31/12/2018 20/12/2018 $188,297 $122,240
31/12/2017 6/12/2017 $215,807 $117,112
31/12/2016 8/12/2016 $112,244 $141,999
31/12/2015 16/12/2015 $136,147 $164,911
31/12/2014 12/11/2014 $2,308,888 $272,704

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Catherine Joy Taylor Trustee 1/09/2018
Andrew Gordon Archer Trustee 26/09/2017
Rodney Desmond Slater Trustee 26/09/2017

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Simon Glen Watts Trustee 17/10/2020
Matthew Roberts Trustee 19/03/2019
Tim Shaw Trustee 26/09/2017
Joanne Patricia Fitzpatrick Trustee 16/03/2017
Simon Gentry Trustee 12/11/2014
Rae Ah Chee Trustee 31/07/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
12/02/2021 NOC015
23/10/2020 NOC013
1/04/2019 NOC011
30/10/2018 NOC009
26/05/2017 NOC007
23/11/2016 NOC005
23/11/2016 NOC004
24/02/2015 NOC002
12/11/2014 NOC001

Charity Documents