pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Hutt Minoh House Friendship Trust
Hutt Minoh Friendship House
CC29099
9429043114559
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Private Bag 31912
Lower Hutt
5040
38 Normandale Road
Normandale
Lower Hutt
5010

Charity's other details

04 570 6666
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/huttminoh
Twitter icon image
www.twitter.com/huttminoh
www.instagram.com/huttminoh


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

For charitable purposes for the development and provision of Japanese education and cultural awareness and to sponsor, support, provide monetary and organisational assistance to develop cultural awareness programmes and activities that will benefit and contribute to the advancement of good relationships between the people of the Wellington region (principally Lower Hutt) and their Japanese sister cities.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

International activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation

General public

Entity Structure

The Trust comprises a Board of Trustees that provide governance of the Trust. Trustees are elected representatives from Lower Hutt community sectors, local iwi, Victoria University and Minoh City Office. A management committee (soon to be members association) provides the operational elements of the Trust including programmes, events and promotions. Hutt City Council provides administrative support and manages the Hutt Minoh Friendship House to support the Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31/12/2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31/12/2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 - - - - To be filed
28/02/2018 28/02/2018 $17,325 $26,376
31/12/2016 29/03/2017 $28,567 $31,188
31/12/2015 21/12/2015 $28,282 $34,905
31/12/2014 16/11/2014 $24,017 $28,530
31/12/2013 13/01/2014 $23,033 $19,457
31/12/2012 31/12/2012 $23,840 $26,828
31/12/2011 30/12/2011 $30,656 $13,619
31/12/2010 9/02/2011 $31,253 $26,072
31/12/2009 7/12/2009 $34,039 $15,307

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Anthony McCombs Trustee 16/11/2016
Sarah Knowles Trustee 16/11/2016
Susan Lytollis Trustee 16/11/2016
Akinora Nishioka Trustee 1/07/2016
James Lamb Secretary 27/02/2012
Ray Wallace Trustee 1/03/2011
Mark Te One Trustee 8/04/2009
Tetsuro Kurata Trustee 8/04/2009
Ted Clay Trustee 1/07/2003

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Evon Murrell Trustee 16/11/2016
Simon Marsh Trustee 16/11/2016
Wayne Guppy Trustee 16/11/2016
Katsuhiko Ogino Trustee 30/06/2016
Ngaire Best Trustee 16/09/2013
Gary Craig Treasurer 30/06/2013
David Ogden Trustee 1/03/2011
Hayley Wain Trustee 1/03/2011
Kazuo Ohtake Trustee 1/03/2011
Yukiko Ishibashi Trustee 4/05/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/11/2016 NOC009
17/11/2014 NOC008
6/08/2012 NOC005
10/03/2011 NOC004
28/05/2010 NOC003
17/04/2009 NOC002

Charity Documents