pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Tread Lightly Charitable Trust
CC25846
9429043162321
Registered

Registration details

12/06/2008
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The Urban Ecoliving Charitable Trust 13/06/2008
Tread Lightly Charitable Trust 14/03/2019

Address for service

PO Box 26253
Epsom
Auckland
1344
130 The Drive
Epsom
Auckland
1023

Charity's other details

022 1099 207
Facebook icon image
http:/www.facebook.com/treadlightlycaravan


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Tread Lightly Charitable Trust (TLCT) - formerly Urban EcoLiving Charitable Trust - was established in 2007 with the vision to "inspire New Zealanders to live sustainably". The TLCT achieves this vision through two programmes which are offered to primary and intermediate schools across the Auckland region: the Tread Lightly Caravan (TLC) and the Tread Lightly Drain Game. In addition, the TLCT was running a Soft Plastics Recycling Programme in schools until November 2018 - this been put on hold in view of recent recycling events. The long term goals of the Tread Lightly programmes are to teach Auckland students and their families of the environmental consequences of their everyday lives, and to inspire positive behaviour change to create actual environmental benefits such as reduced waste to landfill, reduced pollution in our creeks and streams and a greater consciousness when making consumer decisions.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Environmental Education), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Environment / conservation

Education / training / research, Environmental education

Children / young people

General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 28/09/2018 $191,017 $179,407
30/09/2017 26/09/2017 $156,052 $130,516
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $114,560 $143,598
30/09/2015 11/09/2015 $146,768 $145,221
30/09/2014 21/08/2014 $157,197 $176,300
30/09/2013 11/09/2013 $193,635 $231,659
30/09/2012 14/08/2012 $104,131 $162,701
30/09/2011 31/08/2011 $58,562 $61,472
30/09/2010 19/07/2010 $264,093 $41,928
30/09/2009 3/06/2009 $42,540 $37,951

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alice Andrew Trustee 21/05/2015
Chris Walton Trustee 11/12/2007
Julian Nixon Trustee 11/12/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Gael Ogilvie Trustee 29/07/2019
Christopher Wilkins Trustee - Board Member 21/11/2016
Stephen Ellett Trustee 1/08/2015
Brent Ogilvie Trustee 21/05/2015
Stephen Stokes Trustee 31/03/2009

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/08/2019 NOC013
14/08/2019 NOC012
19/07/2019 NOC011
12/03/2019 NOC010
20/02/2017 NOC007
11/09/2015 NOC005
25/06/2015 NOC004
19/07/2010 AR003
3/06/2009 AR002

Charity Documents