pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Gisborne Volunteer Centre
CC27533
9429043125487
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

Block 1, Shop 2, Treble Court Complex
25 Peel St
Gisborne
4010

Charity's other details

(06)8684522
Facebook icon image
Gisborne Volunteer Centre


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support and assistance to volunteers, community welfare agencies and other not-for profits organisations which need volunteers by means of: a) Providing quality programmes of volunteer referral to non-profit organisations. b) Assisting and educating non-profit organisations which use volunteers in how to train and manage them, to the benefit of both the organisation and the volunteer. c) Actively promoting the benefits of volunteer work. d) Advocating the rights and responsibilities of volunteers, and the recognition of their work. e) To increase the awareness of the availability and value of volunteers and volunteerism.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Provides advice / information / advocacy, provides workshops

Promotion of volunteering

Education / training / research, Health, Environment / conservation, Social services, Employment, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, Animals, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Trust Structure: Our Trust Deed states that we must have between five and ten Trustees. As at our 2016 AGM, we have nine Trustees, including the Chairperson, Treasurer and Secretary, we also have a Youth Representative. Operational Structure: We employ a manager, recruitment and referral coordinator and an office administration support worker. We also have a volunteer website administrator and casual volunteers who help with various activities throughout the year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 5/10/2020 $122,288 $121,070
31/12/2019 20/10/2019 $135,721 $141,791
31/12/2018 26/09/2018 $119,205 $107,191
31/12/2017 20/09/2017 $91,558 $94,066
31/12/2016 12/10/2016 $89,458 $84,543
31/12/2015 29/09/2015 $82,780 $91,855
31/12/2014 24/09/2014 $96,501 $77,470
31/12/2013 25/09/2013 $69,301 $67,958
31/12/2012 25/09/2012 $65,251 $71,765
31/12/2011 26/09/2011 $70,147 $69,940

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Amber Aitkenhead Board Member 5/10/2020
Nicki Liversage Board Member 17/10/2019
Michael West Secretary 17/10/2017
Michelle Belinda Whitley Deputy Chairperson 20/09/2016
Brian Charles Cochrane Treasurer 18/10/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Briar Hunter Board member 30/06/2020
Lillian Jenner Board Member - Youth Rep 17/10/2019
Brittany Marshall Board Member 9/09/2019
James Jnr Aramoana Trustee 9/09/2019
Murray Carl Pedersen Chairperson 15/07/2019
Arish Naresh Board Member 15/04/2019
Careen Jack Board member 15/04/2019
Diane Carter Secretary 19/09/2017
Fleur Chantal Paenga Chairperson 19/09/2017
Monique Carlyle Youth representative 19/09/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/02/2020 NOC031
22/10/2019 NOC030
8/07/2019 NOC028
27/06/2019 NOC027
15/11/2018 NOC026
15/11/2018 NOC025
20/09/2017 NOC023
19/09/2017 NOC021
18/09/2017 NOC020
29/09/2015 NOC018

Charity Documents