pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Acromegaly Society
CC46693
N/A
Registered

Registration details

16/06/2011
March 31

Address for service

THE NEW ZEALAND ACROMEGALY SOCIETY
PO Box 302
Morrinsville
3340
The New Zealand Acromegaly Society
PO Box 302
Morrinsville
3340

Charity's other details

021889446
Facebook icon image
NZ Acromegaly Society


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support and education to our members

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, Patient Counselling

Other (please state)

(People with our rare condition)

Entity Structure

A shared Chair and committee

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 13/08/2019 $1,852 $3,653
30/09/2018 15/08/2018 $3,118 $4,033
30/09/2017 29/08/2017 $5,543 $4,950
30/09/2016 7/12/2016 $18,626 $6,113
30/09/2015 26/09/2015 $3,229 $2,838
30/09/2014 9/09/2014 $1,435 $2,318
30/09/2013 4/11/2013 $2,642 $2,593
31/08/2012 22/08/2013 $6,218 $110

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Alison Frances Chester Communications Officer 10/06/2018
Wayne Holtham Treasurer 16/05/2015
Clark McPhillips Newsletter Editor & Grants Manager 24/05/2014
Jackie Jeffrey Secretary 22/07/2012
Catherine Chan Chair 28/02/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David Liebezeit Members Support 5/05/2018
Matthew Cuthill South Island Rep 23/04/2017
Ross Allan South Island Rep 16/05/2015
Donna Judith Bosson Public Relations 24/05/2014
Bronwen Evelyn Biggar Committee Member 22/07/2012
Thomas Foster Biggar Treasurer 22/07/2012
Nicholas William Rogers Committee Member 23/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
17/05/2015 NOC004
19/07/2014 NOC003
12/09/2013 AR002
7/07/2012 AR001

Charity Documents