pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

World Animal Protection Incorporated
CC40786
9429043021628
Deregistered
31/12/2017

Financial information at the time of Deregistration:

$0
$0

Below are details of World Animal Protection Incorporated at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
WSPA New Zealand Incorporated 30/06/2008
World Animal Protection 30/04/2014
World Animal Protection Incorporated 10/06/2014

Address for service

Private Bag 93220
Parnell
Auckland
1151
Level 1
18 Heather Street
Parnell
Auckland
1052

Charity's other details


Africa

Kenya

South America

Brazil

Asia

Thailand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Promotion of effective means for the protection of animals and the conducting of projects for the prevention of cruelty to and relief of suffering to animals.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Cares For Animals), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Care / protection of animals

Animals

General public

Entity Structure

World Animal Protection is a truly global organisation, working in over 50 countries across the world, with offices in every continent. Our vision is a world where animal welfare matters and animal cruelty has ended. We protect animals because we believe a sustainable future for the planet can only be achieved if both animals and people are part of the solution.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2017 27/06/2017 $3,973,543 $3,972,763
30/06/2016 14/06/2016 $6,133,700 $6,131,438
30/06/2015 25/05/2015 $4,393,534 $4,396,854
30/06/2014 20/05/2014 $4,407,229 $4,406,283
30/06/2013 3/07/2013 $4,258,169 $4,258,291
30/06/2012 17/07/2012 $3,857,524 $3,867,603
30/06/2011 6/06/2011 $2,755,305 $2,755,276
30/06/2010 10/05/2010 $3,178,587 $3,150,770
30/06/2009 29/06/2009 $3,100,885 $3,094,687

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kevin Leonard Geeson Director 30/11/2016
Stephen Corri Director 30/04/2014
Peter William Mason Director 1/05/2008

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Margaret Olive West Director 30/09/2016
Hugh John Wirth Director 27/11/2015
Nicholas Martin Stevens Director 30/05/2014
David Michael Frost Director 28/04/2014
Robert James Kerridge Director 28/04/2014
Michael James Baker Director 24/05/2011
Peter Ronald Davies Director 30/06/2009
Timothy Ian Bowman Director 1/05/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/03/2017 NOC013
19/12/2016 NOC011
14/12/2015 NOC009
3/06/2014 NOC008
3/06/2014 NOC007
7/05/2014 NOC006
7/05/2014 NOC005
17/07/2012 AR005
6/06/2011 AR004
10/05/2010 AR003

Charity Documents