pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Voice for Selective Mutism
CC52788
Registered

Registration details

24/09/2015
March 31

Address for service

380 Rakau Road
Reporoa
3081

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/voiceforsm/
Twitter icon image
voiceforsm
instagram voiceforsm

Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To do anything which may be for the betterment and assistance of persons affected by Selective Mutism; To raise awareness of Selective Mutism and to provide support and education to those who suffer from Selective Mutism and to those who are affected by Selective Mutism, Parents, Care-Givers and Professionals alike.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Education / training / research

Health, Social services

Children / young people

Voluntary bodies other than charities, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2017 14/09/2017 $201 $287
30/09/2016 8/03/2017 $472 $2,216

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kathryn Jane Harper Trustee 14/09/2015
Toni Karen Pakula Trustee 14/09/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Alison Peacock Trustee and Treasurer 14/11/2017
Anna Elizabeth Stella Brooks Trustee 9/10/2017
Rachel Louise Dell Trustee 5/10/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/11/2017 NOC004
18/10/2017 NOC003

Charity Documents