pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Love Soup
Soup Kitchen, Food Rescue
CC49692
N/A
Registered

Registration details

22/09/2013
June 30

Address for service

37C Alice Avenue
Orewa
0931
37C Alice Avenue
Orewa 0931
Orewa
0931

Charity's other details

0220749526
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/Love-Soup-Waikato-Bay-Of-Plenty-722726387809261/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Since 2013 Love Soup is not-for-profit. Our food rescue plan (collecting good food that would be either dumped or given to farmers) in some areas we provide free, health-focused meals for Elderly. Families, & Children. We distribute food to organisations that give to those in need. Love Soup delivers food to organisations all over the north Island and have adapted to the needs of each community. Successfully helping over 1000 people a week

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Food Rescue, Alleviate Poverty, Food Bank)

Health

Community development, Social services, Religious activities, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Our goal is to alleviate hunger & poverty by soliciting, collecting, growing, and packaging food for distribution through a network of service agencies and programs that serve our target population groups. Love Soup will seek support from the community & charitable organizations and will seek funding applications and corporate sponsorship. Our client base is low-income people, mainly families & elderly, who need emergency help to put food on the table.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2018 24/04/2019 $54,495 $47,874
31/12/2017 28/07/2018 $88,126 $86,915
31/12/2016 15/09/2016 $99,051 $104,892
31/12/2015 23/08/2015 $46,905 $51,760
31/08/2014 10/06/2014 $26,631 $21,771

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Andrew Darrow Committee 1/05/2020
Andrew Smallman Committee 1/05/2020
Steven Gillott Committee 1/05/2020
June Waith Trustee 22/03/2016
Sarah Anne King Committee Member 14/01/2014
Julie Anne King Treasurer 1/07/2013
Simon David King Chairman 1/07/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Brian Moke Pouwhare Trustee / Cook 1/04/2020
Maggie Chan Trustee 1/04/2020
Pamela Misiluti Trustee 1/04/2020
Elmer Pieffer Trustee 15/09/2016
Gina Pieffer Trustee 15/09/2016
Margaret Ceda Cowley Trustee 15/09/2016
Santon Vitale Trustee 15/09/2016
Terri Vitale Trustee 15/09/2016
Marina Pullen Secretary 30/04/2015
Marlene Ahuriri Trustee 30/04/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/05/2020 NOC022
25/05/2020 NOC021
25/05/2020 NOC020
25/04/2019 NOC017
23/04/2016 NOC014
23/04/2016 NOC013
23/04/2016 NOC012
23/04/2016 NOC011
24/08/2015 NOC010
30/04/2015 NOC009

Charity Documents