pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Transparency International (New Zealand) Incorporated
CC32305
9429043064069
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 10123
The Terrace
Wellington Central
Wellington
6143

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/TINZ.org/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote transparency, good governance and ethical practices in all sectors of society in NZ; to promote ethical business practices by NZ business offshore and transparency and good governance in our region; and to contribute to the international effort to reduce corruption and promote good governance and ethical business practices

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Economic development

Education / training / research, International activities

General public

Entity Structure

TINZ is an accredited chapter of Transparency International (Berlin). Board: Between 5-12 members who are voluntary Board members plus others with Delegated Authority Operations: Managed by Board. Executive Officer (paid) from 1 July 2016, previously pro-bono. Paid contract staff include accounts and membership officer, administrative support, website and newsletter manager, and other contract roles for projects

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2019 6/11/2019 $383,615 $370,871
31/12/2018 31/10/2018 $315,953 $265,478
31/12/2017 22/03/2018 $358,556 $295,387
31/12/2016 24/11/2016 $513,672 $506,679
31/12/2015 16/11/2015 $221,047 $181,141
31/12/2014 4/02/2015 $195,829 $226,311
31/12/2013 25/11/2013 $282,494 $269,547
31/12/2012 7/01/2013 $38,929 $39,449
31/12/2011 12/12/2011 $362,711 $347,809
31/12/2010 6/12/2010 $494,277 $482,212

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ferdinand Balfoort Director 4/11/2019
Tod Cooper Director 27/08/2019
Tong Luke Qin Director 27/08/2019
Karen Coutts Director 18/02/2019
Avon Adams Director 29/10/2018
John Hall Director 29/10/2018
Stephanie Hopkins Director 29/10/2018
Julie Haggie Chief Executive Officer 6/09/2018
Henry Lynch Director 30/04/2018
John Hopkins Director 30/04/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
David McNeill Director 4/11/2019
Tim Goodrick Director 12/04/2019
Christine Stevenson Director 31/03/2019
Josephine Serrallach Director 15/12/2018
Charles Hett Director 29/10/2018
Gus van de Roer Director 29/10/2018
Lisa Traill Director 25/06/2018
Conway Powell Director 30/04/2018
Mark Sainsbury Director 16/03/2018
Bryce Edwards Director 30/10/2017

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/11/2019 NOC026
15/04/2019 NOC025
12/07/2018 NOC023
15/05/2018 NOC022
2/05/2018 NOC021
19/06/2017 NOC019
19/06/2017 NOC018
25/05/2016 NOC016
25/05/2016 NOC015
18/04/2015 NOC014

Charity Documents