pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Bowel Cancer New Zealand Incorporated
Beat Bowel Cancer Aotearoa; Beat Bowel Cancer New Zealand; BBCA; BBCNZ; BCNZ
CC44166
9429043208883
Registered

Registration details

10/05/2010
March 31
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Beat Bowel Cancer Aotearoa Incorporated 11/05/2010
Bowel Cancer New Zealand Incorporated 16/04/2015

Address for service

PO Box 301517
Albany
Auckland
0752
C/o Farry & Co
Level 7 Forsyth Barr House
The Octagon
Dunedin
9016

Charity's other details

Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/BCNZ.org.nz/
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/BowelCancerNZ


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Bowel Cancer New Zealand is a nationwide, patient-led organisation committed to reducing the impact of bowel cancer on our community through awareness, education, support and research.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Health

Education / training / research, Fund-raising, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(People affected by Bowel Cancer), Children / young people, Older people, General public, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

An Incorporated Society and Registered Charity governed by an Executive Committee of up to ten unpaid members plus two paid part time positions of Executive Officer and Administrator. The Executive Committee together with the Executive Officer meet monthly. BCNZ depends heavily on volunteers nationwide for support. BCNZ has access to medical advice from a panel of clinicians.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $290,443 $267,704
30/09/2018 17/10/2018 $193,318 $177,370
30/09/2017 29/09/2017 $187,775 $187,019
30/09/2016 30/09/2016 $262,897 $205,241
30/09/2015 30/09/2015 $282,716 $255,820
30/09/2014 1/10/2014 $130,829 $141,230
30/09/2013 30/09/2013 $87,024 $60,346
30/09/2012 17/10/2012 $41,086 $34,696
30/09/2011 19/09/2011 $75,423 $40,710

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Annika Lim Executive Committee Member 28/08/2018
Louisa Graham Executive Committee Member 28/08/2018
Stefan Corbett Executive Committee Member 28/08/2018
Kevin Jones Treasurer 17/10/2017
Rachel Afeaki-Taumoepeau Executive Committee Member 17/10/2017
Rebekah Heal Executive Officer 11/04/2016
Trisha Cooney Chairperson 5/10/2015
Peter Kenrick Krijger Deputy Chairperson 29/11/2009
Sarah Louise Derrett Executive Committee Member 29/11/2009

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kimberly Tall Administrator 14/01/2019
Garath Roberts Chairperson 2/10/2018
Nicola Russell Executive Committee Member 2/10/2018
Rachel Holdaway Executive Committee Member 2/10/2018
Kirsten Maclean Executive Committee Member 30/06/2017
Samantha Jukes Executive Committee Member 12/04/2017
Justine Ann Falkenhaug Executive Committee Member 14/11/2016
Cath Henderson Executive Committee Member 6/09/2016
Sue Soper Secretary 6/09/2016
Mary Bradley Executive Committee Member 15/04/2016

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/10/2019 NOC021
14/11/2018 NOC019
19/07/2018 NOC017
24/03/2018 NOC016
11/12/2017 NOC015
23/05/2016 NOC012
21/12/2015 NOC011
16/11/2015 NOC010
30/04/2015 NOC009
15/01/2015 NOC008

Charity Documents