pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


E Tipu E Rea Whānau Services
Thrive
CC45477
9429043212873
Registered

Registration details

3/10/2010
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Thrive Teen Parent Support Trust 4/10/2010
E Tipu E Rea Whanau Services 28/01/2020
E Tipu E Rea Whānau Services 25/03/2020

Address for service

PO Box 44005
Point Chevalier
Auckland
1246
482 Swanson Road
Ranui
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

095514367
Facebook icon image
@Etipuereaws


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote the health and wellbeing of young people, young parents and young whanau and their tamaiti of Maori descent or any ethnic origin, age, gender and or sexual orientation

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Work to strengthen and uplift young people, young parents and families.

Social services

Health, Community development, Youth Development

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities

Entity Structure

Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/01/2020 18/12/2019 $454,664 $417,424
31/12/2018 30/12/2018 $455,701 $444,623
31/03/2018 7/02/2018 $414,563 $497,685
31/12/2016 18/10/2016 $418,306 $409,987
31/12/2015 1/12/2015 $410,995 $588,472
31/12/2014 28/01/2015 $690,862 $656,550
31/12/2013 30/01/2014 $676,529 $610,584
31/12/2012 30/10/2013 $412,005 $389,316
31/12/2011 14/02/2012 $181,950 $33,355

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Charlene Maree Fitisemanu Trustee 17/10/2019
Natalie Vincent Trustee 24/09/2019
Dr Jade Le Grice Trustee 3/07/2018
Josie Smith Chair 29/01/2015
Te Miria James-Hohaia Trustee 29/01/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Tina Barclay Trustee 14/10/2019
Wilson Irons Trustee 13/05/2019
Ngaire Ashmore Trustee 22/02/2016
Leigh Harris Secretary 29/01/2016
Ruth Kerr Trustee 31/08/2015
Carmel Sepuloni Board Member 4/09/2014
Maria Kekus Trustee 4/09/2014
Rochana Sheward Trustee 4/09/2014
Niles Newberry Board Member 15/07/2014
Irina Cherkasova Treasurer 21/01/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/03/2020 NOC031
28/01/2020 NOC030
20/12/2019 NOC028
26/11/2019 NOC026
21/10/2019 NOC025
16/09/2019 NOC024
13/05/2019 NOC023
10/07/2018 NOC021
7/06/2018 NOC020
15/01/2018 NOC019

Charity Documents