pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Asia Harvest Trust
CC38321
9429043107230
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 1757
Queenstown
9348
Restricted

Charity's other details

03 339 8660
03 339 8656

Asia

Thailand


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To devote Income and apply donations received to or for any charitable purpose in New Zealand and Asia. Being for the furtherance of Christianity, the relief of hunger, poverty and suffering and the improvement of physical and mental health and welfare.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Makes grants / loans to individuals

Religious activities

Religious groups

Other charities

Entity Structure

Receiving Donations from individuals, churches and charitable organisations and distributing them to approved organisations for the distribution to specific projects.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/06/2019 22/07/2019 Restricted Restricted Restricted Restricted
30/06/2017 26/07/2017 $1,154,053 $1,299,985
30/06/2016 3/05/2017 $1,129,807 $514,228
30/06/2015 2/07/2015 $1,811,089 $294,192
30/06/2014 23/07/2014 $458,000 $225,000
30/06/2013 11/07/2013 $506,000 $252,000
30/06/2012 12/07/2012 $548,000 $219,000
30/06/2011 20/06/2011 $422,000 $523,000
30/06/2010 1/07/2010 $391,000 $561,000

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Restricted

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
15/11/2017 NOC007
27/07/2017 NOC006
23/02/2012 NOC002
8/07/2009 AR002

Charity Documents