pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Group Summary


Group Members


Below are all the members of Roman Catholic Diocese of Auckland Group.

Group members are required to complete individual annual returns. This information is available on each charity's individual summary.

Click into the individual members below to view their charity summary.

Member Charities
Assumption of Onehunga Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Christ The King Of Owairaka Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Good Shepherd of Balmoral Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Cross of Henderson Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Cross of Papatoetoe Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Family Of Kerikeri Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Family of Te Atatu Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Holy Name of Warkworth Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Immaculate Conception of Ellerslie Ecclesiastical Goods Trust
Roman Catholic Diocese of Auckland Ecclesiastical Goods Trust

Group Details


Roman Catholic Diocese of Auckland Group

Registration details

Registered
30/06/2008
CC29111
December 31

Address for service

Private Bag 47904
Ponsonby
Auckland
1144
30 New Street
Saint Marys Bay
Auckland
1011

Group's other details

0064 9 360 3022
0064 9 376 2829


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Please refer to the individual members of this group for their annual return information.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 Please refer to the group member(s) to view the Annual Returns.
30/06/2016 8/07/2016 $41,645,688 $37,881,229
30/06/2015 8/07/2015 $39,962,351 $35,688,633
30/06/2014 23/07/2014 $49,775,839 $36,609,852
30/06/2013 8/07/2013 $38,026,000 $33,400,000
30/06/2012 24/07/2012 $36,761,000 $33,202,000
30/06/2011 8/07/2011 $37,261,000 $31,569,000
30/06/2010 7/07/2010 $38,059,000 $28,364,000
30/06/2009 9/07/2009 $50,324,000 $24,015,000

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Accommodation / housing, Education / training / research, Community development, Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Fund-raising, Disability, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Children / young people


Group Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the group, for example, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
24/07/2012 AR005
9/07/2009 AR002

Group Documents