pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Effective Charitable Trust
CC51659
N/A
Registered

Registration details

18/03/2015
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 6011
Wellesley Street
Auckland
1141
C-/ John W Hart Limited
Level 6, 36 Kitchener Street
Auckland Central
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details


North America

United States

Asia

Israel


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The primary charitable purpose of the Trust is to make distributions to charitable entities whose goals include the promotion or advancement of: (a) renewable and/or independent energy; (b) the remembrance of the Holocaust; and (c) economic and social development in Israel.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

International activities

Environment / conservation, Community development, Economic development

Other charities

Entity Structure

This charity functions on its own, receiving donations and making donations to other charitable bodies

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 27/07/2020 $3,827,336 $3,844,921
30/09/2019 26/09/2019 $6,257,275 $7,262,056
30/09/2018 1/11/2018 $3,744,123 $3,847,814
30/09/2017 8/03/2018 $5,673,843 $4,849,833
30/09/2016 19/10/2016 $5,406,447 $6,139,971
30/09/2015 2/11/2015 $2,727,025 $1,611,716

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Fiducie Limited Trustee 12/03/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
19/10/2016 NOC001

Charity Documents