pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


MPHS Community Trust
CC46419
9429043229314
Registered

Registration details

5/04/2011
June 30
Name change history
Name Effective Date
MPHS Initiative for Neighbourhood Learning 6/04/2011
MPHS Community Trust 6/01/2015

Address for service

PO Box 21211
Henderson
Auckland
0650
27 Corban Avenue
Henderson
Auckland
0612

Charity's other details

09 8384820
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/mphscommunity


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

MPHS is a responsive community development charity rooted in McLaren Park and Henderson South with a West Auckland focus. Our mission is to mobilise effective community leadership that initiates, supports and advocates for a healthy thriving community PEOPLE - PRIDE - PLACE

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Community development

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Social services

General public

Children / young people, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Our governance structure consists of Chair, Treasurer and Trustees, our constitution says we must have no less than three and no more than eight trustees. We currently have seven trustees. Operational we have a FTE of 18 staff including a Chief Executive who reports directly to the Chair and Board. The CE is responsible for all operations including 8 direct reports from team leaders

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 19/11/2019 $1,461,529 $1,514,775
31/12/2018 23/11/2018 $1,510,740 $1,432,642
31/12/2017 26/11/2017 $1,382,664 $1,314,995
31/12/2016 5/12/2016 $1,144,984 $989,339
31/12/2015 23/12/2015 $1,030,622 $1,014,695
31/12/2014 17/12/2014 $1,192,637 $1,201,183
31/12/2013 23/12/2013 $0 $51
31/12/2012 10/01/2013 $23,500 $22,543
31/12/2011 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Esther Goh Trustee 28/08/2017
Mark Chelton Trustee 26/06/2017
Lionel Anderson Trustee 23/05/2016
Kimberly Rees Trustee 25/11/2013
Will Ward Trustee 25/11/2013
Rosemary Joy Allen Trustee 23/02/2011

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Peter Thomas Trustee 1/05/2020
Clementine Ludlow Trustee 30/05/2017
Marilyn Manukia Trustee 16/01/2017
Gary Todd Stewart Trustee 1/05/2015
Loga Crichton Trustee 12/12/2014
Noeline Waru Davis Trustee 12/11/2014
Rochana Sheward Trustee 18/12/2013

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
21/07/2020 NOC016
26/07/2017 NOC011
20/06/2017 NOC010
17/03/2017 NOC009
10/03/2017 NOC008
5/09/2016 NOC006
29/10/2015 NOC005
9/01/2015 NOC004
11/11/2014 NOC003
10/12/2012 AR001

Charity Documents