pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Association Of Jehovah's Witnesses
CC29352
9429043114122
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
August 31

Address for service

Po Box 280
Ingleburn
NSW
Australia
1890
112 Jellicoe Road
Panmure
Auckland
1072

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Charitable purpose of the Association is to promote the Christian faith and study of the Bible, in accordance with the beliefs of Jehovah’s Witnesses, and to undertake relief work in times of disaster and other adversity, both in New Zealand and overseas.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Our Association operates a non-profit charity, incorporated as a Charitable Trust. Individuals meeting the qualifying criteria set forth in our Association rules are designated as members of the charity. The temporal secular affairs of the Association are administered by a Committee appointed from among its members. This Committee acts as Board of Trustees of the Charitable Trust.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 28 Feb 2009 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 28 Feb 2010.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
28/02/2021 9/02/2021 $6,730,361 $5,700,059
29/02/2020 11/12/2019 $6,725,815 $6,434,591
28/02/2019 24/01/2019 $5,581,515 $5,024,819
28/02/2018 28/02/2018 $5,354,692 $5,299,885
28/02/2017 27/02/2017 $5,791,530 $6,128,994
29/02/2016 11/02/2016 $10,893,445 $14,011,165
28/02/2015 27/02/2015 $14,040,569 $9,455,054
28/02/2014 21/02/2014 $2,394,963 $124,421
28/02/2013 28/02/2013 $1,045,441 $591,250
29/02/2012 22/11/2011 $888,508 $1,173,427

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Russell Vaughan Guy Committee Member 6/11/2019
Grant Malcolm Beazley Committee Member 22/11/2017
Ivan Enrique Novion Committee Member 22/11/2017
Stuart Peter Bull Committee Member 22/11/2017
Donald Serge Harris Committee Member 12/06/2007

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Philip Morgan Committee Member 6/11/2019
Alan John Wood Chairman 22/11/2017
Graeme Phillip Martin Committee Member 22/11/2017
Kenneth Montgomery Gower Committee Member 22/11/2017
Terrence John O'Brien Secretary 22/11/2017
Ayleen Charles Pritchard Committee Member 14/08/2012
John Verrant Wills Committee Member 14/08/2012
Michael Joseph Krammer Committee Member 14/08/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/12/2019 NOC014
10/12/2019 NOC011
12/03/2018 NOC009
6/12/2017 NOC007
28/02/2013 AR005
15/08/2012 NOC001
9/11/2010 AR003
4/12/2009 AR002

Charity Documents