pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Bellyful New Zealand Trust
Bellyful
CC46995
9429043222483
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
Bellyful New Zealand Trust Board 29/06/2011
Bellyful New Zealand Trust 6/09/2018

Registration details

29/06/2011
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 51267
Tawa
Wellington
5249
14 Cambridge Street
Tawa
Wellington
5028

Charity's other details

0508 2355938
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/BellyfulNZ/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Vision Statement A Bellyful branch in reach of every New Zealand family who needs us. Mission Statement To cook and deliver meals to families with newborn babies and families with young children who are struggling with illness, where there is little or no family or social support.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(To cook and deliver meals to families with newborn babies and families with young children who are struggling with illness, where there is little or no family or social support. )

Social services

Community development, Promotion of volunteering

Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Bellyful is governed by a Board of Trustees with an Executive Director managing operational matters. The Board of Trustees meet on a monthly basis. All Trustees and the Executive Director are volunteers. Bellyful operates a branch structure with a centralised shared service centre. There are currently 18 branches. Funds raised at branch level are retained and used in the local communities, except for an admin fee and a 10% Fundraising Fee which are trnsf to the National office.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 11/09/2018 $368,515 $268,106
30/09/2017 15/09/2017 $242,128 $190,184
30/09/2016 28/09/2016 $185,608 $156,919
30/09/2015 18/09/2015 $171,715 $161,046
30/09/2014 25/09/2014 $145,100 $158,524
30/09/2013 13/12/2013 $100,806 $75,675
30/09/2012 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Karalyn van Deursen Trustee 16/06/2018
MIchelle Kitney Trustee 30/04/2018
Rebecca Morahan Trustee 3/10/2016
Iris Richter Trustee 21/12/2015
Leigh Taggart Trustee 21/12/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jennie Wyllie Trustee 30/04/2018
Fiona Morris Trustee 13/01/2018
Jacquline Nicole Ritchie Trustee 11/07/2017
Lynda Maree Schoen Trustee 21/12/2015
Rosemary Joe Palmer Trustee 21/12/2015
Toni Maree Prowse Trustee 21/12/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/09/2018 NOC012
18/06/2018 NOC011
2/05/2018 NOC010
14/04/2018 NOC009
7/02/2018 NOC008
18/04/2017 NOC006
19/10/2016 NOC005
5/10/2016 NOC004
18/02/2016 NOC002

Charity Documents