pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


New Zealand Rheumatology Association Incorporated
CC30207
9429042870821
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

Private Bag 4710
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140
17 Brook Street
Level 13, 191 Queen Street
The Brook
Nelson
7010

Charity's other details



Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To award fellowships to members and associate members for NZ and/or overseas research or training or training course.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Sponsors / undertakes research

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Education / training / research

Health, People with disabilities

Other (please state)

(Arthritis patients, researchers), Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

The entity is governed by trustees who are subject to the powers and discretions set out in the founding documentation and relevant legislation

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 2/10/2020 $142,975 $148,801
30/09/2019 30/09/2019 $172,320 $242,002
30/09/2018 26/09/2018 $661,462 $444,368
30/09/2017 28/09/2017 $19,413 $34,198
30/09/2016 22/02/2017 $22,716 $31,122
30/09/2015 31/03/2016 $36,157 $22,797
30/09/2014 29/09/2014 $152,615 $69,848
30/09/2013 20/12/2013 $44,121 $37,344
30/09/2012 21/12/2012 $118,453 $18,019

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Mark Sapsford Executive Officer 5/09/2020
Sarah Jordan Executive Officer 5/09/2020
Michael Corkill Treasurer 7/09/2019
Tracey Kain Executive Officer 7/09/2019
Vicki Quincey Executive Officer 22/05/2017
Rebecca Grainger Executive Officer 6/09/2015
William Taylor Secretary 24/08/2014
Nicola Dalbeth President 1/08/2009
Lisa Stamp Executive Officer 4/09/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Douglas White Secretary 5/09/2020
Jo Mitchell Executive Officer 5/09/2020
The New Zealand Guardian Trust Company Limited Custodian Trustee 16/03/2020
Daniel Ching Executive Officer 6/09/2019
David Porter Treasurer 6/09/2019
Keith Colvine Executive Officer 6/09/2019
Steven Sawyers Executive Officer 6/09/2019
Fiona McQueen Executive Officer 28/08/2016
Paul Healy Treasurer 6/09/2015
Raoul Stuart President 6/09/2015

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/10/2020 NOC016
26/11/2019 NOC013
26/09/2018 NOC011
1/10/2014 NOC007
9/09/2013 AR006
22/08/2012 AR005
17/08/2011 AR004
11/02/2011 AR003
20/05/2009 AR002
10/11/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents