pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Polaris Charitable Trust
CC31779
N/A
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 123
Queenstown
9348
35 Shotover Street
Queenstown
9300

Charity's other details

(03)4501807


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promoting safer and kinder environment for animals

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides other finance (e.g. investment funds)

promoting safer and kinder environment for animals

Care / protection of animals

Animals

Entity Structure

To promoting safer and kinder environment for animals

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 20/10/2020 $3,205,088 $3,121,868
30/09/2019 25/08/2020 $3,236,535 $3,119,594
30/09/2018 7/06/2020 $7,674,250 $7,219,200
30/09/2017 14/03/2018 $832,518 $2,423,700
30/09/2016 23/04/2017 $832,518 $2,423,700
30/09/2015 24/04/2017 $2,665,265 $2,201,853
30/09/2014 15/12/2014 $4,051,730 $3,237,723
30/09/2013 24/11/2014 $981,848 $2,946,270
30/09/2012 7/08/2014 $868,602 $2,005,120

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Reiko Sugiyama Trustee 30/06/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
7/10/2011 AR004
24/08/2009 AR002

Charity Documents