pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


BotanyLife Community Church Incorporated
CC22407
Registered

Registration details

1/04/2008
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 58375
Botany
Auckland
2163
272E TI Rakau Drive
Burswood
Auckland
2013

Charity's other details

(09)274 4242


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

(1) To advance and promote the Christian faith and accomplish our mission of “passionately loving God and purposefully loving others”. (2) To organise church services where people can worship God and listen to accurate Bible teaching. (3) To accurately and consistently teach, explain and apply the Bible to the lives of all those involved in the Church, through church services, small groups and other events and programmes. (4) To gather congregational members into small groups to encourage each other, grow and learn together, pray together, and serve the wider community. (5) To help people discover a relationship with God through Jesus Christ, and to assist them to grow in that relationship. (6) To run varied programmes for families, youth and children to lead them to a relationship with Jesus, teach them Biblical truth, and equip them to impact their world for God.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy

Religious activities

Community development, Social services

General public

Children / young people, Older people, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

Incorporated society

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
BotanyLife Community Trust CC28770

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2018 27/06/2018 $617,488 $619,392
30/06/2017 31/08/2017 $628,405 $554,516
30/06/2016 26/07/2016 $518,694 $522,442
30/06/2015 19/06/2015 $465,224 $558,309
30/06/2014 25/06/2014 $481,903 $554,933
30/06/2013 25/07/2013 $321,253 $313,715
30/06/2012 28/06/2012 $286,367 $269,782
30/06/2011 21/06/2011 $316,123 $207,955
30/06/2010 30/06/2010 $435,057 $424,998
30/06/2009 22/05/2009 $323,420 $350,628

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Steve Young Elder 1/07/2016
Stuart Jones Elder 1/03/2015
Andre Kirstein Elder 25/06/2014
Brad Carr Senior Pastor / Elder 1/02/2004

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
KK Leong Elder 1/12/2017
Todd Hughes Elder 1/12/2016
Steve Young Elder 25/06/2014
Harataki Manihera Elder 31/12/2012
Cliff Hand Elder 31/12/2011
Stan Bloxham Elder / Chairman 31/12/2011
Harry Manihera Elder 1/08/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
25/06/2014 NOC007
25/07/2013 AR006
22/07/2013 NOC001
28/06/2012 AR005
21/06/2011 AR004
30/06/2010 AR003
22/05/2009 AR002

Charity Documents