pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


NZ Mathematical Society Incorporated
New Zealand Maths Society or NZMS
CC40109
9429042793335
Registered

Registration details

17/05/2009
December 31

Address for service

Mathematics & Statistics, University of Canterbury
Private Bag 4800
Christchurch Central
Christchurch
8140

Charity's other details

044639695


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To promote research and education in the mathematical sciences and to promote the development, application and dissemination of mathematical knowledge within New Zealand. To assist mathematicians in New Zealand to maintain effective cooperation with one another and with mathematicians and mathematical societies in other countries, and to facilitate collaborative research in the mathematical sciences as a consequence of such cooperation.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Promotes mathematical sciences), Makes grants / loans to individuals, Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Education / training / research

Other (please state)

(Mathematicians and mathematics graduate students, general public)

Entity Structure

The membership of the Society consists of three classes of members-ordinary, honorary, and institutional members. The governing body of the Society consists of one elected President, one elected Vice-President, and seven elected members. The Council meets at least once a year, and at other times if requested by the President or at least three members of Council. There is an Annual General Meeting, usually held in December.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2021 29/07/2021 $32,780 $13,332
31/08/2020 5/02/2021 $38,670 $32,791
30/09/2019 6/09/2019 $25,474 $18,716
30/06/2018 28/01/2019 $30,596 $25,703
30/06/2017 26/04/2018 $27,107 $22,648
30/06/2016 7/11/2016 $26,765 $23,976
30/06/2015 8/12/2015 $30,303 $16,744
30/06/2014 16/12/2014 $50,006 $31,869
30/06/2013 6/12/2013 $26,517 $24,726
30/06/2012 11/07/2012 $27,199 $20,451

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Geertrui Van de Voorde Council member 30/07/2021
Bernd Krauskopf Council member 1/01/2021
David Bryant President 1/01/2021
Dominic Nigel Searles Council member 1/01/2021
Stephen Joe Council member 1/01/2021
Graham Donovan Council member 3/12/2019
Thomasin Ann Lynch Council member 3/12/2019
Sahana Cidambi Council member (Postgraduate) 6/09/2019
Melissa Tacy Council member 4/12/2018
Phillip Wilson Secretary 4/12/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Florian Beyer Council Member 31/12/2020
Kevin Broughan Council member 31/12/2020
Rua Murray Secretary 31/12/2020
Shaun Hendy President 31/12/2020
Vivien Kirk Vice President 31/12/2020
Emily Harvey Council Member 3/12/2019
Shaun Cooper Council Member 6/09/2019
Emma Greenbank Council member 7/06/2019
Astrid an Huef Vice-President 4/12/2018
Mark Joseph McGuinness Council Member 4/12/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
5/12/2019 NOC023
8/09/2019 NOC022
10/12/2018 NOC019
26/06/2018 NOC018
8/05/2018 NOC017
22/02/2018 NOC015
15/02/2018 NOC014
31/01/2018 NOC013
26/01/2018 NOC012
22/12/2017 NOC011

Charity Documents