pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The New Zealand Archive of Film Television and Sound Nga Taonga Whitiahua me Nga Taonga Korero
Nga Taonga Sound and Vision
CC22250
Registered
Name change history
Name Effective Date
The New Zealand Film Archive 28/03/2008
The New Zealand Archive of Film Televsion and Sound Nga Taonga Whitiahua me Nga Taonga Korero 1/07/2014

Registration details

27/03/2008
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 11449
Manners Street
Wellington
6142
84 Taranaki Street
Te Aro
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

04 8964 826


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Ngā Taonga Sound & Vision is New Zealand’s moving image and sound archive. We are an independent charitable trust. Our purpose is to collect, share and care for New Zealand's audiovisual taonga.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Acts as an umbrella / resource body

Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Archiving of film

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau

Entity Structure

Ngā Taonga Sound & Vision is governed by a Board of Trustees, whose skills reflect archival expertise, screen and audio industry experience, knowledge of tikanga, and governance experience. Day-today management responsibilities are led by a Leadership Team of six including the Chief Executive.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2017 26/10/2017 $7,706,788 $7,837,183
31/12/2016 18/12/2016 $7,477,499 $8,211,912
31/12/2015 12/01/2016 $8,143,982 $6,969,530
31/12/2014 6/12/2014 $5,206,436 $5,072,573
31/12/2013 21/11/2013 $4,365,378 $4,702,953
31/12/2012 30/01/2013 $3,519,646 $4,117,937
31/12/2011 5/12/2011 $3,557,711 $4,095,353
31/12/2010 10/12/2010 $6,093,964 $3,798,355
31/12/2009 17/11/2009 $3,628,324 $3,417,367
31/12/2008 - - - - Exemption

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Emily Loughnan Trustee 1/01/2018
Whetu Fala Trustee 13/10/2017
Lisa Bates Trustee 1/07/2017
Te Raumawhitu Kupenga Trustee 1/07/2017
Simon Murdoch Chair 1/07/2016
Edie Te Hunapo Moke Board member 1/08/2015

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jane Kominik Trustee 31/12/2017
Judith Fyfe Trustee 31/12/2017
Peter Tematakahere Douglas Trustee 10/08/2017
Derek Fox Trustee 16/06/2017
Louise Baker Trustee 30/06/2016
Morris Love Trustee 30/06/2016
Nathan Hoturoa Gray Individual 31/07/2015
Waana Morrell Davis Trustee 30/06/2012
Douglas Napier Eckhoff Trustee 30/06/2011
Filma Anne Phillips Trustee 30/06/2011

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
14/08/2015 NOC011
31/07/2014 NOC010
29/10/2012 NOC007
9/07/2012 NOC006
1/08/2011 NOC005
10/12/2010 AR003
13/10/2010 NOC004
13/10/2010 NOC003
17/11/2009 AR002
23/09/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents