pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Destiny Church Hamilton
CC29070
9429043002528
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
February 28

Address for service

PO Box 12388
Chartwell Square
Hamilton
3248
Flat 5
550 Te Rapa Road
Te Rapa
Hamilton
3200

Charity's other details

078501465
078501467
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/DestinyChurchHamilton/


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To build a great spirit-filled church that would be both redemptive and creative in all it's expressions, impacting the city of Hamilton, the Waikato, New Zealand and the world for Jesus Christ.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides religious services / activities

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Religious activities

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Arts / culture / heritage, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

Religious groups

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, General public, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees

Entity Structure

Trust structure: we currently have five trustees that constitute our governance board, including two senior pastors and two elders. Operational structure: our operations are managed by a team of four employees. We employ two senior pastors, an office administrator and an assistant administrator. Volunteers support us with our various activities throughout the year.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/08/2018 31/08/2018 $610,092 $519,826
31/08/2017 31/08/2017 $578,894 $604,928
31/08/2016 27/08/2016 $494,582 $399,624
31/08/2015 9/09/2015 $449,406 $394,240
31/08/2014 2/10/2014 $447,714 $404,513
31/08/2013 30/08/2013 $469,916 $425,027
31/08/2012 30/08/2012 $486,501 $433,679
31/08/2011 2/09/2011 $451,932 $436,896
31/08/2010 30/08/2010 $413,202 $405,875
31/08/2009 31/08/2009 $448,130 $493,021

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Ben Fraser Stanton Trustee 2/06/2013
Destry Te Rongopai Murphy Trustee 2/06/2013
Shanon Makaro Marsters Trustee 2/06/2013
Alison Kay Ferris Pastor 14/02/2002
John James Ferris Senior Pastor 14/02/2002

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Richard Charles Lewis Trustee 17/09/2013
Leon Wharewehe Samuels Trustee 2/06/2013
Samuel Brian Francis Tamaki Trustee 2/06/2013
Jean Pearl Hunt Trustee 26/06/2012
Peter Roy Hunt Trustee 26/06/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
29/08/2016 NOC007
17/12/2013 NOC006
30/08/2013 AR006
30/08/2012 AR005

Charity Documents