pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Apostleship of the Sea Incorporated
Stella Maris New Zealand
CC31907
9429042582120
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
March 31

Address for service

PO Box 25-563
Wellington
6146
35 Victoria Street
Wellington Central
Wellington
6011

Charity's other details

021 247 6641


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Services to seafarers, fishers and port workers.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities), Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides advice / information / advocacy, Provides buildings / facilities / open space, Provides religious services / activities, Provides facilities for seafarers

Religious activities

Emergency / disaster relief, Social services, Employment, Sport / recreation, Spiritual social and material welfare of all seafarers

Other (please state)

(Seafarers), Religious groups

Entity Structure

Incorporated Society.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2021 - - - To be filed To be filed
30/09/2020 3/11/2020 $122,303 $116,845
30/09/2019 3/11/2020 $118,095 $42,593
30/09/2018 18/09/2018 $103,341 $80,303
30/09/2017 19/09/2017 $119,737 $96,919
30/09/2016 14/10/2016 $103,950 $89,340
30/09/2015 22/08/2016 $68,489 $95,000
30/09/2014 24/05/2014 $84,439 $90,450
30/09/2013 5/06/2013 $80,810 $76,940
30/09/2012 6/06/2012 $70,493 $76,190

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Fr. Jeff Drane National Director 25/05/2013
Peter Connor Treasurer 15/05/2013

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Deacon Sid Wells Deputy Director 1/01/2018
Barbara Jean Semb Vice President 25/05/2013
Garry Conway National Director 25/05/2013
Robin Douglas Adair Secretary/Treasurer 13/02/2013
Paul Hickey Secretary 21/05/2011
Patrick Neville Sweetapple Vice-President 22/05/2010
William Roche Honorary Secretary 22/05/2010

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
18/08/2016 NOC009
17/08/2016 NOC008
17/08/2016 NOC007
5/06/2013 AR006
6/06/2012 AR005
27/06/2011 AR004
27/06/2011 NOC002
17/06/2010 AR003
31/08/2009 AR002

Charity Documents