pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Mayfair Theatre Charitable Trust
CC49918
Registered

Registration details

15/10/2013
June 30

Address for service

PO Box 2423
South Dunedin
Dunedin
9044
Mayfair Theatre
100 King Edward Street
South Dunedin
Dunedin
9012

Charity's other details

03 455 4962


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Provision of a community Theatre

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers)

Arts / culture / heritage

Fund-raising

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Older people, People with disabilities

Entity Structure

Charitable Trust

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2018 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2017 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2016 18/12/2017 $113,918 $101,632
31/12/2015 20/07/2016 $109,254 $97,971
31/12/2014 27/04/2015 $24,429 $35,912

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Geoffrey Patton Chairman 28/08/2013
John Collier Trustee 28/08/2013
Stephen Manning Trustee 28/08/2013
Steven Hydes Treasurer 28/08/2013
William Thomas Fergus Ross Trustee 28/08/2013

Charity Updates


There are no public Update Details change records for this charity.

Charity Documents