pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Dilworth Trust Board
Dilworth School
CC32171
Registered

Registration details

30/06/2008
January 31

Address for service

Private Bag 28904
Remuera
Auckland
1541
2 Erin Street
Epsom
Auckland
1051

Charity's other details

09 523 3179
09 520 1912


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Dilworth Trust Board was established under the will of James Dilworth who died on 23 December 1894. Under the terms of the Will the Trustees are directed to maintain and educate boys from families of good character in "straitened circumstances" to enable them to become "good and useful members of society".

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Other (please state)

(Funds a school for disadvantaged boys.)

Education / training / research

Accommodation / housing, Religious activities, Arts / culture / heritage, Sport / recreation

Children / young people

Former Students

Entity Structure

The Dilworth Trust Board is a trust domiciled in New Zealand and registered under the Charitable Trusts Act 1957 and the Charities Act 2005.

Entities your charity controls

Name CC Registration Number
The Dilworth Foundation CC53690

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/07/2018 28/06/2018 $112,766,000 $33,029,000
31/07/2017 22/06/2017 $94,330,000 $28,587,000
31/07/2016 9/05/2016 $90,369,000 $27,841,000
31/07/2015 17/04/2015 $56,787,000 $23,307,000
31/07/2014 2/04/2014 $50,774,000 $22,644,000
31/07/2013 24/05/2013 $43,112,000 $23,963,000
31/07/2012 11/07/2012 $45,020,000 $32,614,900
31/07/2011 31/05/2011 $21,906,000 $25,576,000
31/07/2010 26/04/2010 $27,346,000 $27,143,000
31/07/2009 21/05/2009 $-8,863,000 $16,397,000

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Peter John Alexander Trustee 27/03/2017
Simon Patrick McCrea Curran Trustee 30/03/2015
Aaron Peter Snodgrass Trustee 1/05/2013
Hugh Fletcher Trustee 1/08/2007
Brian Maltby Trustee 16/07/1990

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Jonathan Wain Trustee 28/04/2018
George Roger Wayne France Trustee 1/10/2016
Derek Sinclair Firth Trustee 23/02/2015
Peter David Hunter Trustee 30/04/2013
John Harry Watson Potter Trustee 30/06/2008

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
6/06/2018 NOC013
27/06/2017 NOC012
7/02/2017 NOC010
2/02/2017 NOC009
10/12/2015 NOC008
28/05/2013 NOC005
24/05/2013 NOC004
28/09/2012 NOC003
15/10/2008 NOC002

Charity Documents