pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Community Action on Suicide Prevention & Research Trust
Casper
CC46140
Deregistered
03/05/2017
This entity was removed from the Charities Register under section 32(1)(b) of the Charities Act because it failed to file Annual Returns as required by section 41 of the Charities Act.

Below are details of Community Action on Suicide Prevention & Research Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

9/02/2011
March 31

Address for service

77B Tainui Street
Tokoroa
3420

Charity's other details

02108536956

Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Makes grants / loans to individuals, Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Education / training / research

Health, Social services, Welfare Support

Family / whanau

Children / young people, General public


Annual Returns


Exemptions

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 30 September 2011 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 30 September 2012.

Date Submitted For Year Ended Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
- 31/03/2017 - - - -
- 31/03/2016 - - - -
- 31/03/2015 - - - -
27/01/2015 31/03/2014 $92,050 $101,025
31/10/2013 31/03/2013 $135,554 $131,238
28/11/2012 31/03/2012 $33,520 $9,237

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Maria Jane Bradshaw Trustee 21/11/2010

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Leonie Fennell Trustee 31/03/2014
Tony Donnelly Trustee 31/03/2014
Jay Scanlon Trustee 30/10/2013
Michael Pero Trustee 30/10/2013
Steve Green Trustee 8/02/2013
Anthony John Ebert Trustee 1/02/2012
Marco Marinkovich Trustee 1/02/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
8/03/2017 NOC007
30/03/2014 NOC006
13/11/2013 NOC005
7/11/2013 NOC004
28/11/2012 AR001
15/03/2011 NOC002

Charity Documents