pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


The Aunties
CC54387
N/A
Registered

Registration details

8/03/2017
March 31

Address for service

P O Box 76638
Manukau
Auckland
2241
80 Albrecht Avenue
83 Glengarry Road
Mount Roskill
Auckland
1041

Charity's other details

0279113030
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/RefugeAunties/
Twitter icon image
@whaeapower


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide sustained support to vulnerable and marginalized people within our community.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Social services

Fund-raising

Family / whanau

Children / young people, Other charities

Entity Structure

We have a board of (a minimum of) seven members (with three officers – chairperson, secretary and treasurer) based in Auckland. We have a deed which governs how we operate. Our deed dictates that for all decisions to be past they must be by a majority.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2019 - - - - To be filed
30/09/2018 15/04/2019 $143,604 $120,926
30/09/2017 18/09/2017 $46,742 $53,212

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Kathryn Jane Horne Treasurer 23/07/2018
Moeroa Marsters Chair 25/06/2018
Sabrina Muck Trustee 26/03/2018
David Jackson Perry Trustee 27/02/2017
Jacqueline Goodison Trustee 27/02/2017
Julie Margaret Fairey Secretary 27/02/2017
Michele Edith A'Court Patron 27/02/2017
Paul Brislen Trustee 27/02/2017
Philippa Warin Trustee 11/07/2016

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Kerry Heather McLeod Trustee 29/10/2018
Elaine Janet Jacobsen Trustee 28/05/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
27/08/2018 NOC008
23/07/2018 NOC006
23/07/2018 NOC005
5/12/2017 NOC004
24/07/2017 NOC002

Charity Documents