pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Deregistration details

Shepherd Charitable Trust
CC49451
Deregistered
15/12/2016
This entity was removed from the Charities Register at their request under section 32(1)(f) of the Charities Act 2005. The entity has wound up and transferred its assets to another entity for charitable purposes.

Below are details of Shepherd Charitable Trust at the date of deregistration:

Registration details

12/08/2013
December 31

Address for service

PO Box 1194
Shortland Street
Auckland
1140
c/o Asiaciti Trust New Zealand Limited
34 Shortland Street, Level 10
Auckland
1010

Charity's other details


Purpose & Structure


Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Makes grants to organisations (including schools or other charities)

Accommodation / housing

Education / training / research, Health, International activities, People with disabilities, Food & Water

Children / young people

Other charities, Older people, Women In Need


Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/06/2017 - - - - To be filed
30/06/2016 7/06/2016 $2,472,595 $3,905,552
30/06/2015 28/08/2015 $1,411,461 $3,705,329
30/06/2014 20/08/2014 $2,173,709 $536,962

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Bellerive Trustee Limited Trustee 10/12/2012

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
13/07/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents