pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Love Kawatiri Community Trust
Love Kawatiri
CC56414
N/A
Registered

Registration details

14/08/2018
June 30

Address for service

10A Lyndhurst Street
Westport
7825

Charity's other details

02102956498
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/lovekawatiri


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

Love Kawatiri is a vehicle for supporting the development of community-led projects, initiatives and community enterprises in the communities of the Kawatiri/Buller District. Empowered by our passions and strengths the Trust: - Engages, supports and nurtures people to turn their passions into action - Connects people, creates networks and enables collaboration - Provides coordination of resources to support community initiatives - Communicates and celebrates our stories and successes

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Community development

Education / training / research, Arts / culture / heritage, Economic development, Fund-raising

General public

Entity Structure

Love Kawatiri is based in Westport and serves the communities of Kawatiri/Buller district. Our trust deed states that we must have between five and nine trustees, consisting of a diverse range of community representatives. We currently have seven trustees that constitute our governance board, including four executive positions including a chairperson, deputy-chairperson, secretary and treasurer.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
31/12/2020 - - - - To be filed
31/12/2019 22/10/2019 $8,066 $2,890

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Stephen Alan White Trustee 26/08/2020
Eliza Beth Allington Trustee 25/08/2020
Jonathan Lee Colyer Trustee 25/08/2020
Peter Garry Howard Trustee 5/05/2020
Jessica Lauren Paley-Atkins Secretary 5/11/2019
Wayde Michael Dunlop Chairperson 5/11/2019
Daniel Reynolds Treasurer 13/08/2018
Dida Scanlon Deputy Chairperson 13/08/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Amelia Grace Baker Trustee 25/08/2020
Gillian Elizabeth Dowsett Trustee 25/08/2020
Nicky Meadowcroft Trustee 25/08/2020
Hannah Green Trustee 30/04/2020
Glenn Irving Chairperson 31/03/2020
Kane Hogan Trustee 5/11/2019
Peter Campbell Treasurer 5/11/2019

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
26/08/2020 NOC006
25/08/2020 NOC005
13/04/2020 NOC003
5/11/2019 NOC002

Charity Documents