pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Art Deco Trust Incorporated
CC21328
9429042577935
Registered

Registration details

24/02/2008
August 31

Address for service

PO Box 133
Napier
4140
7 Tennyson Street
Napier South
Napier
4110

Charity's other details

(06) 835 0022
Facebook icon image
www.facebook.com/artdecotrust
Twitter icon image
https://twitter.com/artdecotrust


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

The Art Deco Trust Incorporated mission is "Committed to the preservation, restoration, promotion and celebration of our Art Deco era heritage for the benefit of Napier and Hawkes Bay." The Trust's Strategic Goals include; - Mission driven with "Heritage at Heart" in all we do, - Be fully engaged with our Community, - Knowledge leaders in Art Deco heritage, - Develop effective partnerships through strong stakeholder engagement, - Deliver fit for purpose facilities and events, - Strengthen and grow our financial position and future sustainability.

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides advice / information / advocacy

Sponsors / undertakes research, Acts as an umbrella / resource body, Provides services (e.g. care / counselling), Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Education/Tourism

Arts / culture / heritage

Education / training / research, Environment / conservation, Community development, International activities, Economic development, Tourism

General public

Children / young people, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Family / whanau, Local Bodies/Tourists

Entity Structure

"The Art Deco Trust Incorporated is an incorporated society with a Governance Board of upto seven Board Members, comprising a Chair, a Vice Chair and five ordinary Board members. There are three elected Board Members one of whom must be Chair, whilst there are upto four appointed Board Members one of whom is a nomination from the Napier City Council. All the Board Members have a mix of different skill sets, attributes and capabilities to ensure the Trusts future sustainability and success.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
28/02/2021 18/12/2020 $2,339,565 $2,205,838
29/02/2020 1/12/2019 $2,337,758 $2,309,536
28/02/2019 12/12/2018 $2,126,851 $2,124,604
28/02/2018 12/02/2018 $1,907,092 $2,025,641
28/02/2017 10/01/2017 $1,983,226 $1,941,894
29/02/2016 21/03/2016 $825,142 $830,785
28/02/2015 15/03/2015 $857,100 $804,232
28/02/2014 28/02/2014 $703,811 $723,942
28/02/2013 30/01/2013 $1,627,430 $1,577,816
29/02/2012 30/03/2012 $1,537,236 $1,477,619

Annual return table statuses:

• Not paid – We have not matched a payment with the Annual Return.
• Processing – We have to do some work in the background to process the Annual Return.
• Not required – This charity was deregistered for this year, and the annual return is not required.
• If there is no entry, the charity may have made a request to have the information withheld for public interest reasons.

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Barbara Wendy Arnott Chair 25/11/2020
Benjamin Stewart Hutton Board Member 25/11/2020
Jeremy Smith Heritage Manager 23/11/2020
Simon Paul Dunn Board Member 29/01/2020
Rachel Bashnick Board Member 26/11/2019
Pamela Reading-Windle Board Member 27/11/2018
Stuart Ainslie Board Member 27/11/2018
Tania Wright Board Member 27/11/2018

Past Officers

Officer Name Position Past Since
Michael Fowler Board Chair 20/11/2020
Hamish Saxton Board Member 26/08/2020
Donald Garth Cowie General Manager 31/07/2020
Neil Barber Board Member 26/11/2019
Vaughan Walsh Board Member/Treasurer 26/11/2019
Victoria Emma Rope Acting General Manager 16/08/2019
Annie Dundas Vice Chair 31/03/2019
Ann Galloway Board Member 27/11/2018
Judy Rasmussen Board Member 27/11/2018
Matthew Bonnett Board Member 27/11/2018

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
3/03/2021 NOC037
18/12/2020 NOC035
17/07/2020 NOC034
10/02/2020 NOC033
10/02/2020 NOC032
11/12/2019 NOC031
9/12/2019 NOC030
2/12/2019 NOC028
21/11/2019 NOC026
9/10/2019 NOC025

Charity Documents


Notices

This charity has been granted an exemption from filing an annual return by 31 December 2008 under Section 43 of the Charities Act 2005. The first annual return is due by 31 December 2009.