pattern
Charities Logo
Charities Tag Line - Supporting Charities in New Zealand for Stronger Communities

Use this to find information about a particular charity.

Charity Summary


Charity Details


Love Soup Rotorua
Love Soup Aotearoa
CC51404
N/A
Registered

Registration details

7/02/2015
March 31

Address for service

2 Ross Road
Western Heights
Rotorua
3010

Charity's other details

02040295203
Facebook icon image
https://www.facebook.com/groups/Lovesouprotorua/?ref=bookmarks


Purpose & Structure


Charitable Purpose

To provide support through food, clothing and assist with acquiring accommodation for the Rough Sleepers and Homeless of Rotorua

Note: The main sectors, activities and beneficiaries are bolded.

Provides services (e.g. care / counselling)

Sponsors / undertakes research, Provides human resources (e.g. staff / volunteers), Provides buildings / facilities / open space

Health

Education / training / research, Community development, Social services, Fund-raising, People with disabilities, Promotion of volunteering

General public

Children / young people, Other charities, Voluntary bodies other than charities, Older people, People with disabilities, People of a certain ethnic / racial origin, Family / whanau, Migrants / refugees, Religious groups

Entity Structure

We receive donations of food, clothing and household items from the Rotorua community and businesses to operate our evening meals 7 nights a week to the rough sleeping and homeless community. To provide clothing for those who require it for the elements, and to furnish their accommodation when housed. We provide ongoing support once housed.

Annual Returns


Annual Returns are due within 6 months of a charity’s balance date (financial year-end), or a longer period if an extension has been granted.

Due Date Date Submitted Total Income Total Expenditure Financial Statements Annual Return Summary
30/09/2018 30/09/2018 $34,642 $35,592
30/09/2017 26/10/2017 $29,995 $31,360
30/09/2016 18/05/2017 $24,664 $24,649
30/09/2015 28/08/2015 $0 $10,139

Officer Details


Officers

Officer Name Position Effective Date
Carole Gulde Trustee 2/05/2015
Steven Chapman Trustee 2/05/2015
Sandra Webb Trustee 21/04/2015
Elmer Klynn Peiffer Treasurer 1/10/2014
Georgina-Marie Ngahiriwha Peiffer Chairman 1/10/2014
Julie Anne King Secretary 1/10/2014

Charity Updates


Here is a list of all the details changed by the charity, for example adding or removing officers, amending rules, changing balance dates or updating address details.
Date Created Reference View Summary (.pdf <1MB)
16/03/2016 NOC002
14/05/2015 NOC001

Charity Documents